EP3377923 - HORIZON-BASED SPLITTING INTENSITY INVERSION FOR ANISOTROPIC CHARACTERIZATION OF A TARGET VOLUME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Geoquest Systems B.V. Gevers Deynootweg 61 2586 BJ The Hague / NL | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOIERO, Daniele Flat 8 58 London Road Royal Tunbridge Wells Kent TN1 1DT / GB | 02 /
BAGAINI, Claudio Schlumberger House Buckingham Gate Gatwick Sussex RH6 0NZ / GB | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 16866813.5 | 14.10.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016US56928 | Priority number, date | US201562257023P | 18.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562257023 P | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017087100 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3377923 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3377923 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/28 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
G01V1/28 (EP,US);
G01V1/284 (EP,US);
G01V1/30 (US);
G01V1/362 (US);
G01V2210/586 (EP,US);
G01V2210/626 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HORIZONTBASIERTE SPALTUNGSINTENSITÄTSINVERSION ZUR ANISOTROPEN CHARAKTERISIERUNG EINES ZIELVOLUMENS | [2018/39] | English: | HORIZON-BASED SPLITTING INTENSITY INVERSION FOR ANISOTROPIC CHARACTERIZATION OF A TARGET VOLUME | [2018/39] | French: | INVERSION D'INTENSITÉ DE DIVISION BASÉE SUR L'HORIZON POUR CARACTÉRISATION ANISOTROPE D'UN VOLUME CIBLE | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 14.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | ES | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | IT | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | LU | 14.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
LU | 14.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
LU | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 05.04.2023 | |
PT | 07.08.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4903244 (ALFORD RICHARD M [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US2014297193 (MATTOCKS BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [XAI] - A. SIEMINSKI ET AL, "Finite-Frequency SKS Splitting: Measurement and Sensitivity Kernels", SEISMOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA. BULLETIN, US, (20080801), vol. 98, no. 4, doi:10.1785/0120070297, ISSN 0037-1106, pages 1797 - 1810, XP055605695 [X] 1,3,5,7-9,11,12 * abstract * * The Splitting Intensity; page 1800 * * page 1805, column l, paragraph last * * page 1808, column r, lines 1-16 * [A] 10,13 [I] 2,4,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1785/0120070297 | [XAI] - FANSHENG KONG ET AL, "A Systematic Comparison of the Transverse Energy Minimization and Splitting Intensity Techniques for Measuring Shear-Wave Splitting Parameters", SEISMOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA. BULLETIN, US, (20141209), vol. 105, no. 1, doi:10.1785/0120140108, ISSN 0037-1106, pages 230 - 239, XP055605451 [X] 1,3,5,6,11,12 * abstract * * Complex Anisotropy Recognition; page 233 * * page 232, column l, paragraph first * [A] 8-10,13 [I] 2,4,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1785/0120140108 | [X] - NOÉMIE FAVIER ET AL, "Sensitivity kernels for shear wave splitting in transverse isotropic media", GEOPHYSICAL JOURNAL INTERNATIONAL., GB, (20030401), vol. 153, no. 1, doi:10.1046/j.1365-246X.2003.01894.x, ISSN 0956-540X, pages 213 - 228, XP055606016 [X] 1,6-9 * abstract * * page 222, paragraph 3.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-246X.2003.01894.x | International search | [Y]US6625542 (HARDAGE BOB [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See column 4, lines 13-48, column 9, lines 42-47 and claim 1. *; | [Y]US2010128563 (STROBBIA CLAUDIO LUCIANO [IT], et al) [Y] 5, 14 * See abstract and paragraph [0045]. *; | [A]US2010128562 (BLIAS EMANOUIL [US]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0037] and figures 1-4. *; | [A]US2010238765 (GRECHKA VLADIMIR [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See abstract and paragraphs [0019]-[0037]. *; | [Y] - LONG, MAUREEN D. et al., "Shear Wave Splitting and Mantle Anisotropy: Measurements, Interpretations, and New Directions", Survey in Geophysics, (20090600), vol. 30, no. 4-5, pages 407 - 461, XP019729597 [Y] 1-20 * See pages 407-428. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10712-009-9075-1 | Examination | US6625542 |