EP3377572 - FLAME RETARDANT COMPOUND INCLUDING HOST-GUEST COMPLEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Optical Communications LLC 4200 Corning Place Charlotte, NC 28216 / US | [2020/09] |
Former [2018/39] | For all designated states Corning Optical Communications LLC 800 17th Street NW Hickory, NC 28601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Dayue 3394 Conhocton Road Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | 02 /
LANGFELD, Kirsten Graacher Strasse 1 12247 Berlin / DE | 03 /
WILLIAMSON, Brandon Robert 2005 20th Street Place NE Hickory, NorthCarolina 28601 / US | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 16866823.4 | 19.10.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016US57623 | Priority number, date | US201562256890P | 18.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562256890 P | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017087115 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3377572 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08K9/06, C08K9/04, C08K3/24, C08K3/34, C08K5/08, C08K5/098, C08K5/13, C08K5/1545, C08K5/21, C08K5/39, C08K5/405, C09D7/40, C08L23/08, C08L23/06, G02B6/44, H01B3/30, H01B3/44, H01B7/295, C08K3/22 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08K3/24 (EP,US);
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08K5/08 (EP,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08K5/13 (EP,US);
C08K5/1545 (EP,US);
C08K5/21 (EP,US);
C08K5/39 (EP,US);
C08K5/405 (EP,US);
C08L23/0853 (EP,US);
G02B6/4436 (US);
H01B7/295 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2255 (EP,US);
C08L2201/02 (US);
C08L2201/08 (US);
C08L2203/202 (US);
C08L2205/03 (US);
C08L2207/066 (US);
H01B3/302 (EP,US);
H01B3/305 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L5/12, C08L23/0853, C08K3/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/39] | C08K9/06, C09D7/12, C08K9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Title | German: | FLAMMHEMMENDE VERBINDUNG MIT HOST-GUEST-KOMPLEX | [2018/39] | English: | FLAME RETARDANT COMPOUND INCLUDING HOST-GUEST COMPLEX | [2018/39] | French: | COMPOSÉ IGNIFUGE CONTENANT UN COMPLEXE HÔTE-INVITÉ | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 18.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN103435844 ; | [YA]EP0921174 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [Y] 13 * page 2, paragraphs 7,12 * * page 6, paragraphs 44,45,50; example - * [A] 1-12; | [XAYI] - ISHIKAWA T ET AL, "Preparation of Calix [8] arene and combustion of its blends", KOBUNSHI RONBUNSHU, SOCIETY OF POLYMER SCIENCE JP, (200602), vol. 63, no. 2, doi:10.1295/KORON.63.124, pages 124 - 134, XP002790918 [X] 1,9-12 * the whole document * [A] 14 [Y] 2,3,13 [I] 6-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1295/KORON.63.124 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2014, no. 30, Database accession no. 2014-C70029, XP002790919 & CN103435844 A 20131211 (CHINESE ACAD SCI NINGBO MATERIAL TECHNOL) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | [Y] - JENNY ALONGI ET AL, "Cyclodextrin nanosponges as novel green flame retardants for PP, LLDPE and PA6", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, (20120228), vol. 88, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.carbpol.2012.02.038, ISSN 0144-8617, pages 1387 - 1394, XP055121764 [Y] 2,3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbpol.2012.02.038 | [A] - WANG BIBO ET AL, "Cyclodextrin microencapsulated ammonium polyphosphate: Preparation and its performance on the thermal, flame retardancy and mechanical properties of ethylene vinyl acetate copolymer", COMPOSITES:PART B, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140928), vol. 69, doi:10.1016/J.COMPOSITESB.2014.09.015, ISSN 1359-8368, pages 22 - 30, XP029096158 [A] 1-14 * page 23, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compositesb.2014.09.015 | International search | [XY]US2003057406 (YANG WU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 and 9-13 * , entire document, especially abstract, para [0004], [0005], [0012], [0036], [0037], [0038], [0041], [0063], [0066], [0067] * [Y] 5-8, 14-36; | [A]US2005009965 (SCHELL KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-36* , entire document *; | [Y]US2009022462 (PAPAZOGLOU ELISABETH S [US], et al) [Y] 5, 14, 17, 18, 27 * , entire document, especially abstract, para [0012], [0016], [0025], [0046] *; | [Y]US2012224818 (KARAYIANNI ELENI [CH]) [Y] 6-8, 15-36 * , entire document, especially abstract, para [0008], [0019], [0067], [0068], [0070], [0071], [0072], [0073], [0081] *; | [A]WO2015028047 (FUNDACION IMDEA MATERIALES [ES]) [A] 1-36 * , entire document, especially abstract, pg 15 In 11-20 * | by applicant | US2003057406 | US2009022462 | - ISHIKAWA T et al., "Preparation of Calix [8] arene and combustion of its blends", KOBUNSHI RONBUNSHU, SOCIETY OF POLYMER SCIENCE JP, (20060200), vol. 63, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1295/KORON.63.124, pages 124 - 134, XP002790918 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1295/KORON.63.124 |