blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3377103

EP3377103 - FUNCTIONAL ANTIBODY FRAGMENT COMPLEMENTATION FOR A TWO-COMPONENTS SYSTEM FOR REDIRECTED KILLING OF UNWANTED CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  07.02.2025
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.02.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.10.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2025Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 12.03.2025  [2025/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Revitope Limited
Angel Building
407 St. John Street
London EC1V 4AD / GB
[2018/39]
Inventor(s)01 / COBBOLD, Mark
1 Everett Avenue
Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US
 [2018/39]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
Chapel Quarter
Mount Street
Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB
[2025/11]
Former [2021/11]Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2018/39]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Application number, filing date16867215.218.11.2016
[2018/39]
WO2016US62748
Priority number, dateUS201562257552P19.11.2015         Original published format: US 201562257552 P
US201562270907P22.12.2015         Original published format: US 201562270907 P
[2018/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017087789
Date:26.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3377103
Date:26.09.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3377103
Date:17.03.2021
Language:EN
[2021/11]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP3377103
Date:12.03.2025
Language:EN
[2025/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.05.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2018
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, C07K14/47, C07K16/26, C07K16/18, C07K16/28, C07K16/30, A61K38/00, A61K39/00, A61P35/02, A61P37/04, A61P43/00
[2020/38]
CPC:
C07K16/2809 (EP,CN,US); A61K39/39558 (CN,US); A61P35/00 (EP,CN);
A61P35/02 (EP,CN); A61P37/04 (EP,CN); A61P43/00 (EP,CN);
C07K16/18 (US); C07K16/2863 (EP,US); C07K16/2896 (EP,US);
C07K16/30 (EP,CN,US); C07K16/303 (EP,US); A61K2039/505 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US); C07K2317/31 (EP,CN,US); C07K2317/569 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,CN,US); C07K2317/94 (EP,CN,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/49]A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, C07K14/47, C07K16/26, C07K16/18, C07K16/28, C07K16/30, A61K38/00, A61K39/00
Former IPC [2018/39]A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, C07K14/47, C07K16/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/39]
TitleGerman:KOMPLEMENTIERUNG EINES FUNKTIONELLEN ANTIKÖRPERFRAGMENTS FÜR EIN ZWEI-KOMPONENTEN-SYSTEM ZUR UMGELENKTEN TÖTUNG UNERWÜNSCHTER ZELLEN[2018/39]
English:FUNCTIONAL ANTIBODY FRAGMENT COMPLEMENTATION FOR A TWO-COMPONENTS SYSTEM FOR REDIRECTED KILLING OF UNWANTED CELLS[2018/39]
French:COMPLÉMENTATION DE FRAGMENT D'ANTICORPS FONCTIONNEL POUR UN SYSTÈME À DEUX COMPOSANTS POUR LA DESTRUCTION REDIRIGÉE DE CELLULES INDÉSIRABLES[2018/39]
Entry into regional phase25.05.2018National basic fee paid 
25.05.2018Search fee paid 
25.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
25.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/39]
25.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.06.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2021Fee for grant paid
03.02.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.02.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP21150773.6  / EP3903818
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.12.2021  12.06.2024  WITHDRAWN
Cherry Biolabs GmbH
Mauritiusplatz 7
97286 Winterhausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Kaistraße 16A
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  17.12.2021  16.04.2024  WITHDRAWN
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-8645 / JP
Opponent's representative
Dolphin, Kirsty Mairi, et al, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
 [2024/29]
Former [2024/21]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2021  20.12.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Cherry Biolabs GmbH
Mauritiusplatz 7
97286 Winterhausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Kaistraße 16A
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  17.12.2021  16.04.2024  WITHDRAWN
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-8645 / JP
Opponent's representative
Dolphin, Kirsty Mairi, et al, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Former [2022/07]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2021  20.12.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Cherry Biolabs GmbH
Mauritiusplatz 7
97286 Winterhausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  17.12.2021  11.01.2022  ADMISSIBLE
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-8645 / JP
Opponent's representative
Simpson, Kirsty Mairi
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Former [2022/04]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2021  20.12.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Cherry Biolabs GmbH
Mauritiusplatz 7
97286 Winterhausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
18.01.2022Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.05.2022Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.02.2024Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.02.2024Date of oral proceedings
15.04.2024Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.04.2024Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.07.2024Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.03.2021
CY17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
MK17.03.2021
MT17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SI17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
[2024/41]
Former [2024/22]AL17.03.2021
CY17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
MK17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SI17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
Former [2023/30]AL17.03.2021
CY17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SI17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
Former [2022/33]AL17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SI17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
Former [2022/23]AL17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SI17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
Former [2022/13]AL17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SI17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
IS24.12.2021
Former [2022/10]AL17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
IS24.12.2021
Former [2022/07]AL17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
Former [2021/51]EE17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
Former [2021/50]EE17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
Former [2021/48]EE17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
Former [2021/46]HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
Former [2021/37]HR17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
Former [2021/36]HR17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
Former [2021/35]HR17.03.2021
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2012123755  (UNIV BIRMINGHAM [GB], et al);
 [A]WO2014140358  (AMGEN RES MUNICH GMBH [DE]);
 [XIY]WO2015013671  (CYTOMX THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al)
International search[A]US2009130106  (CHRISTOPHERSON RICHARD IAN [AU], et al);
 [XY]WO2015001361  (UNIV BIRMINGHAM [GB]);
 [A]US2015079093  (STUHLER GERNOT [DE]);
 [A]US2015183875  (COBBOLD MARK [GB], et al);
 [Y]US2015307564  (YOUNG TRAVIS [US], et al)
by applicantWO2007062466
 WO2013104804
 WO2015013671
 US2015183875
OppositionWO2007073499
 WO2012123755
 US2013060010
 WO2013104804
 WO2013128194
 WO2015013671
 US2015183875
 WO2017087789
 US2002076406
 US2008145362
 WO2010081173
 US2011229476
 WO2012158818
 US2014099254
 WO2017156178
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.