Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3376888 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201680078321 CN202110795416 EP16867265 EP21166912 EP22202247 US2016062872W US201615776694 US202016859136 US202217668751 US202318234741



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023389626Global Dossier 07.12.2023A1
Priority number Date
US201815776694 16.05.2018
US202217668751 10.02.2022
WO2016US62872 18.11.2016
US202318234741 16.08.2023
US202016859136 27.04.2020
US201562257544 19.11.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11771147Global Dossier 03.10.2023B2
US2022408854 29.12.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201815776694 16.05.2018
US202217668751 10.02.2022
WO2016US62872 18.11.2016
US202016859136 27.04.2020
US201562257544 19.11.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11253010Global Dossier 22.02.2022B2
US2020253293 13.08.2020A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US62872 18.11.2016
US202016859136 27.04.2020
US201562257544 19.11.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10667566Global Dossier 02.06.2020B2
US2018343930 06.12.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US62872 18.11.2016
US201562257544 19.11.2015
US201615776694 18.11.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4140341Global Dossier 01.03.2023A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US62872 18.11.2016
EP21166912 18.11.2016
EP16867265 18.11.2016
US201562257544 19.11.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3892140Global Dossier 19.10.2022B1
EP3892140 13.10.2021A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US62872 18.11.2016
US201562257544 19.11.2015
EP16867265 18.11.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN113633036Global Dossier 12.11.2021A
Priority number Date
US201562257544 19.11.2015
CN201680078321 18.11.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108471816BGlobal Dossier 30.07.2021B
CN108471816 31.08.2018A
Priority number Date
WO2016US62872 18.11.2016
US201562257544 19.11.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3376888Global Dossier 07.04.2021B1
EP3376888 14.08.2019A4
EP3376888 26.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US62872 18.11.2016
US201562257544 19.11.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017087862Global Dossier 26.05.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201562257544 19.11.2015
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3892140
 EP4140341