EP3377890 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR POOLING SAMPLES FROM MULTI-WELL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takara Bio USA, Inc. 1290 Terra Bella Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNNE, Jude 7400 Paseo Padre Parkway Fremont, California 94555 / US | 02 /
HUSAIN, Syed A. 7400 Paseo Padre Parkway Fremont, California 94555 / US | 03 /
SRINIVASAN, Maithreyan 7400 Paseo Padre Parkway Fremont, California 94555 / US | 04 /
ZEISEL, Amit 7400 Paseo Padre Parkway Fremont, California 94555 / US | 05 /
HOCHGERNER, Hannah 7400 Paseo Padre Parkway Fremont, California 94555 / US | 06 /
LINNARSSON, Sten 7400 Paseo Padre Parkway Fremont, California 94555 / US | 07 /
NASARABADI, Shanavaz L. 7400 Paseo Padre Parkway Fremont, California 94555 / US | 08 /
MANN, Ishminder 7400 Paseo Padrew Parkway Fremont, California 94555 / US | 09 /
ACOB, Ricelle 7400 Paseo Padre Parkway Fremont, California 94555 / US | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/39] | Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 16867274.9 | 18.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016US62888 | Priority number, date | US201562256968P | 18.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562256968 P | US201562264593P | 08.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562264593 P | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017087873 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3377890 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00, B01L3/00, C12Q1/68, C12M1/00, B01L7/00, C12Q1/6869 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
B01L3/5025 (EP,US);
B01L3/50851 (US);
B01L9/523 (US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6874 (US);
B01L2200/021 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0829 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0867 (EP,US);
B01L2300/087 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0893 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0409 (EP,US);
B01L3/50857 (EP,US);
B01L7/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2547/101, C12Q2565/514 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/39] | G01N33/00, B01L3/00, C12Q1/68, C12M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM POOLEN VON PROBEN AUS VORRICHTUNGEN MIT MEHREREN VERTIEFUNGEN | [2018/39] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR POOLING SAMPLES FROM MULTI-WELL DEVICES | [2018/39] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE REGROUPER DES ÉCHANTILLONS PROVENANT DE DISPOSITIFS À PUITS MULTIPLES | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 09.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/20] | 14.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004191924 (HUNTER IAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0064] - [0068]; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2010069257 (HARRIS J KEITH [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0037]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2010261159 (HESS ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0043] - [0047] - [0087] , [ 246]; figures 1-22 *; | [A]US8481292 (CASBON JAMES [GB], et al) [A] 12* the whole document *; | [A] - FÁBIO TADEU ARROJO MARTINS ET AL, "Optimization of simultaneous screening of the main mutations involved in non-syndromic deafness using the TaqMan OpenArray(TM) Genotyping Platf", BMC MEDICAL GENETICS, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20131024), vol. 14, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2350-14-112, ISSN 1471-2350, page 112, XP021169343 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2350-14-112 | International search | [Y]US2004191924 (HUNTER IAN [US], et al) [Y] 9, 23* . Especially claim 1 *; | [Y]US2014130885 (GRISWOLD BRADLEY L [US], et al) [Y] 1-38 * . Especially sheet 1 fig 1, sheet 3 fig 3; para [0003], [0011], [0014], [0019], [0021], [0023], [0029], [0031], [0059] *; | [Y] - MARTINS et al., "Optimization of simultaneous screening of the main mutations involved in non- syndromic deafness using the TaqMan OpenArray Genotyping Platform.", BMC Med Genet, (20131024), vol. 14, no. 112, pages 1 - 9, XP021169343 [Y] 1-38 * ; Especially pg 2 col 2 para 4 continued to pg 3 col 1 para 1; pg 3 fig 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2350-14-112 |