EP3381928 - POLYPEPTIDE BINDING TO A PLURALITY OF AMYLOID MONOMERS AND AGGREGATES, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Wisdom Panacea Biologics Co., Ltd. Room 1802, 18/F, Building No. 1 No. 795 18th Avenue Heda Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310018 / CN | [2019/10] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states Beijing Taiyang Pharmaceutical Industry Co., Ltd. B-1 Shuang Qiao East Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100121 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Ruitian 1 North 2nd Street Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 02 /
YU, Xiaolin 1 North 2nd Street Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/40] | Application number, filing date | 16867934.8 | 21.11.2016 | [2018/40] | WO2016CN106585 | Priority number, date | CN201510831563 | 25.11.2015 Original published format: CN201510831563 | [2018/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017088711 | Date: | 01.06.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3381928 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, C12N15/11, A61K38/08 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (US);
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (EP,US);
C12N15/63 (US);
A61K38/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] | Title | German: | AN MEHRERE AMYLOIDMONOMERE UND AGGREGATE BINDENDES POLYPEPTID UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2018/40] | English: | POLYPEPTIDE BINDING TO A PLURALITY OF AMYLOID MONOMERS AND AGGREGATES, AND USE THEREOF | [2018/40] | French: | POLYPEPTIDE SE LIANT À UNE PLURALITÉ DE MONOMÈRES ET D'AGRÉGATS AMYLOÏDES, ET SON UTILISATION | [2018/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2018 | Translation filed | 22.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 22.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/20] | 15.11.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/50] | 27.12.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 02.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - OSNAT ASHUR-FABIAN ET AL, "The neuroprotective peptide NAP inhibits the aggregation of the beta-amyloid peptide", PEPTIDES, (20030101), vol. 24, doi:10.1016/j.peptides.2003.08.005, pages 1413 - 1423, XP055584219 [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [02.8] * * paragraphs [03.1] - [03.5] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.peptides.2003.08.005 | [X] - Mark A Findeis, "Peptide Inhibitors of Beta Amyloid Aggregation INTRODUCTION ASSAYS AND MECHANISM OF ACTION", Current Topics in Medicinal Chemistry, (20020101), pages 417 - 423, URL: http://docserver.ingentaconnect.com/deliver/connect/ben/15680266/v2n4/s8.pdf?expires=1556543677&id=0000&titleid=3902&checksum=3A24DF31D3B5D6649004785CC1FFACBD, (20190429), XP055584213 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | [X] - LARSSON PAR ET AL, "The complete genome sequence of Francisella tularensis, the causative agent of tularemia", NATURE GENETICS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, US, (20050201), vol. 37, no. 2, doi:10.1038/NG1499, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 153 - 159, XP002421763 [X] 1,2,4-11 * abstract * * page 158, column r, paragraph last * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng1499 | [X] - Larsson, P et al., "Type IV pili lipoprotein [Francisella tularensis subsp. tularensis SCHU S4]", Genbank, (20150227), Database accession no. CAG45690, URL: NCBI, XP002793254 [X] 1,2,4-11 * the whole document * | [X] - A. KHAMIS ET AL, "rpoB Gene Sequencing for Identification of Corynebacterium Species", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20040901), vol. 42, no. 9, doi:10.1128/JCM.42.9.3925-3931.2004, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 3925 - 3931, XP055609453 [X] 1,3-11 * AY492258;; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.42.9.3925-3931.2004 | [X] - Khamis, A et al., "RpoB, partial [Corynebacterium pilosum]", GenBank, (20040914), Database accession no. AAS89220, URL: NCBI, XP002793255 [X] 1,3-11 * AY492258 * |