EP3360195 - POWER BATTERY PACK AND ELECTRICAL VEHICLE HAVING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYD Company Limited No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Desheng No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 02 /
PENG, Qingbo No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 03 /
ZHENG, Weixin No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 04 /
ZHU, Jianhua No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 05 /
ZHU, Yan No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | 01 /
LIU, Desheng No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | ||
02 /
PENG, Qingbo No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | |||
03 /
ZHENG, Weixin No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHU, Jianhua No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | |||
05 /
ZHU, Yan No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/33] | Application number, filing date | 16867942.1 | 21.11.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016CN106662 | Priority number, date | CN201510824394 | 24.11.2015 Original published format: CN201510824394 | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017088719 | Date: | 01.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3360195 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/613, H01M10/6556, H01M2/10, H01M10/625, H01M10/6552, H01M10/6554, B60L58/26, B60L50/64 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
H01M10/613 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6554 (EP,KR,US);
B60L50/50 (CN);
B60L50/64 (EP,KR,US);
B60L58/26 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6552 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6556 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6567 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/204 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/249 (KR);
H01M50/258 (KR);
B60L2240/549 (EP,KR,US);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
H01M2220/20 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/35] | H01M10/613, H01M10/6556, B60L11/18, H01M2/10, H01M10/625, H01M10/6552, H01M10/6554 | ||
Former IPC [2018/33] | H01M10/613 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACK UND ELEKTROFAHRZEUG DAMIT | [2018/33] | English: | POWER BATTERY PACK AND ELECTRICAL VEHICLE HAVING THE SAME | [2018/33] | French: | BLOC-BATTERIE D'ALIMENTATION ET VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE POURVU DE CELUI-CI | [2018/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 26.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 21.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014109034 (HITACHI VEHICLE ENERGY LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0056]; figures 6-9 *; | [A]US2015194714 (YOU GIL JAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0072]; figures 4-10 * |