EP3380844 - METHOD FOR VERIFYING THE PRIMARY STRUCTURE OF PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Jet Biotechnology Inc. 2F., No. 15, Sec. 2 Linong St. Beitou Dist. Taipei City 112 / TW | [2020/42] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states Sun Jet Biotechnology Inc. 1F., No.165, Sec. 2 Xi'an Street Beitou District Taipei City 112 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSAY, Yeou-Guang 10F. No.28 Sec. 5 Chenggong Rd. Neihu Dist. Taipei City 114 / TW | 02 /
CHEN, Ya-Fen 2F. No.15 Sec. 2 Linong St. Beitou Dist. Taipei City 112 / TW | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander, et al 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte - München Keltenring 9 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [2021/01] |
Former [2018/40] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16867992.6 | 23.11.2016 | [2018/40] | WO2016CN106962 | Priority number, date | US201562259031P | 23.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562259031 P | [2018/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017088769 | Date: | 01.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3380844 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3380844 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G06K9/00, H01J49/00 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
G01N33/6848 (EP,US);
G01N33/6851 (EP,US);
G16B15/00 (EP,US);
G16B40/00 (EP,US);
G16B40/10 (EP,US);
H01J49/0036 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/40] | G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG DER PRIMÄRSTRUKTUR VON PROTEIN | [2018/40] | English: | METHOD FOR VERIFYING THE PRIMARY STRUCTURE OF PROTEIN | [2018/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE VÉRIFIER LA STRUCTURE PRIMAIRE D'UNE PROTÉINE | [2018/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 22.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2016 | AL | 06.01.2021 | AT | 06.01.2021 | CY | 06.01.2021 | CZ | 06.01.2021 | DK | 06.01.2021 | EE | 06.01.2021 | ES | 06.01.2021 | FI | 06.01.2021 | HR | 06.01.2021 | IT | 06.01.2021 | LT | 06.01.2021 | LV | 06.01.2021 | MC | 06.01.2021 | MK | 06.01.2021 | PL | 06.01.2021 | RO | 06.01.2021 | RS | 06.01.2021 | SE | 06.01.2021 | SI | 06.01.2021 | SK | 06.01.2021 | SM | 06.01.2021 | NL | 06.02.2021 | BG | 06.04.2021 | NO | 06.04.2021 | GR | 07.04.2021 | IS | 06.05.2021 | PT | 06.05.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009076737 (WANG YONGDONG [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0042] , [0045] , [0057] - [0058] - [0063] - [0078]; figure 5 * [I] 7,8,10-15; | [X] - ANGELINA TAICHRIB ET AL, "High resolution TOF MS coupled to CE for the analysis of isotopically resolved intact proteins", JOURNAL OF PROTEOMICS, vol. 74, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.JPROT.2011.01.006, ISSN 1874-3919, (20110125), pages 958 - 966, (20110125), XP028387666 [X] 1-6,9,13 * abstract * * page 959, left-hand column - right-hand column, bridging paragraph, paragraphs "Results and discussion", "Conclusions";; figures 2,4-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jprot.2011.01.006 | [X] - TIMOTHY W. RHOADS ET AL, "Using Theoretical Protein Isotopic Distributions to Parse Small-Mass-Difference Post-Translational Modifications via Mass Spectrometry", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MASS SPECTROMETRY., US, (20121218), vol. 24, no. 1, doi:10.1007/s13361-012-0500-1, ISSN 1044-0305, pages 115 - 124, XP055595867 [X] 1-6,9,13 * abstract; page 116, left-hand column, last paragraph; page 119, left-hand column;paragraph "Conclusions"; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13361-012-0500-1 | [X] - JAKUBOWSKI J A ET AL, "Screening for post-translational modifications in conotoxins using liquid chromatography/mass spectrometry: an important component of conotoxin discovery", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, vol. 47, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.TOXICON.2006.01.021, ISSN 0041-0101, (20060501), pages 688 - 699, (20060501), XP025007792 [X] 1-3,6,9,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [02.3] , [ 3.1]; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxicon.2006.01.021 | [A] - CHEN YA-FEN ET AL, "Determination of accurate protein monoisotopic mass with the most abundant mass measurable using high-resolution mass spectrometry", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20130604), vol. 440, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.AB.2013.05.018, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 108 - 113, XP028676657 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs "Materials and Methods", "Conclusion" * * page 110, column left * * figures 1,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2013.05.018 | [A] - DAISUKE MIURA ET AL, "A Strategy for the Determination of the Elemental Composition by Fourier Transform Ion Cyclotron Resonance Mass Spectrometry Based on Isotopic Peak Ratios", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20100701), vol. 82, no. 13, doi:10.1021/ac902931x, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 5887 - 5891, XP055385666 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac902931x | [A] - David M Horn ET AL, "Automated reduction and interpretation of high resolution electrospray mass spectra of large molecules", Journal of the American Society for Mass Spectrometry, United States, doi:10.1016/S1044-0305(99)00157-9, (20000101), pages 320 - 332, URL: https://link.springer.com/content/pdf/10.1016/S1044-0305(99)00157-9.pdf, XP055557787 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1044-0305(99)00157-9 |