EP3380577 - COATED PARTICLES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anavo Technologies, LLC 5237 Capital Boulevard Raleigh, NC 27616 / US | [2019/40] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states Tethis, Inc. 8354 Six Forks Road Suite 204 Raleigh, North Carolina 27615 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAN, Ryan Nicholas 2913 Berkeley Springs Place Raleigh North Carolina 27616 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Drew 525 Mountain Lake Drive Raleigh North Carolina 27610 / US | 03 /
MEREDITH, Caleb 204 Hillcrest Road Raleigh North Carolina 27605 / US | 04 /
HOLT, Charlotte 4810 Waterford Club Crossing Apartment 535 Raleigh North Carolina 27612 / US | 05 /
SADEGHIFAR, Hasan 3006 Kings Court Apartment E Raleigh North Carolina 27606 / US | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/40] | 01 /
CHAN, Ryan Nicholas 131 Southwold Drive Raleigh North Carolina 27519 / US | ||
02 /
WILLIAMS, Drew 3703 Burt Drive Raleigh North Carolina 27606 / US | |||
03 /
MEREDITH, Caleb 204 Hillcrest Road Raleigh North Carolina 27605 / US | |||
04 /
HOLT, Charlotte 4810 Waterford Club Crossing Apartment 535 Raleigh North Carolina 27612 / US | |||
05 /
SADEGHIFAR, Hasan 3006 Kings Court Apartment E Raleigh North Carolina 27606 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16869106.1 | 18.11.2016 | [2018/40] | WO2016US62773 | Priority number, date | US201562258976P | 23.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562258976 P | US201662317244P | 01.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662317244 P | US201662324052P | 18.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662324052 P | US201662395621P | 16.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662395621 P | [2018/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017091463 | Date: | 01.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3380577 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/04, C09K8/20, C09K8/80, C09K8/84, C09K8/90 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
C09K8/805 (EP,US);
C09K8/62 (EP,US);
C09K8/70 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETE PARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2018/40] | English: | COATED PARTICLES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME | [2018/40] | French: | PARTICULES REVÊTUES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION | [2018/40] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 18.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/02] | 25.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2002039869 (ACHILLE FELIX [US]) [Y] 29/27-28 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0019]-[0020], [0023], [0033] *; | [Y]US2011095227 (HERTH GREGOR [DE], et al) [Y] 3/1-2 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0002], [0027] *; | [A]US2014060832 (MAHONEY ROBERT P [US], et al) [A] 1-2, 3/1-2, 29/27-28 * ; entire document *; | [A]WO2015130276 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-2, 3/1-2, 29/27-28 * ; entire document *; | [XY]US2015252252 (SOANE DAVID S [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 27-28 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0006], [0009], [0019], [0034], [0043], [0045], [0047], [0063]-[0064], [0069], [0071]-[0072], [0088]-[0089]; claim 1 * [Y] 3/1-2, 29/27-28; | [PY]WO2015187631 (TETHIS INC [US]) [PY] 1* ; entire document * | by applicant | US8975387 | US2015252252 |