EP3381171 - UNIQUELY IDENTIFYING AND SECURELY COMMUNICATING WITH AN APPLIANCE IN AN UNCONTROLLED NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akamai Technologies, Inc. 145 Broadway Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2021/29] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states Akamai Technologies, Inc. 150 Broadway Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILL, Rupinder, Singh 41 Promenade Avenue Robina, Queensland 4226 / AU | 02 /
METTU, Shravan, Kumar c/o Akamai Technologies INC. 150 Broadway Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 03 /
AYYADEVARA, Seetharama, Sarma c/o Akamai Technologies INC. 150 Broadway Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/40] | 01 /
GILL, Rupinder, Singh c/o Akamai Technologies INC. 150 Broadway Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | ||
02 /
METTU, Shravan, Kumar c/o Akamai Technologies INC. 150 Broadway Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
03 /
AYYADEVARA, Seetharama, Sarma c/o Akamai Technologies INC. 150 Broadway Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Representative(s) | TLIP Limited Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | TLIP Limited 14 King Street Leeds LS1 2HL / GB | ||
Former [2018/40] | TLIP Limited Leeds Innovation Centre 103 Clarendon Road Leeds LS2 9DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 16869258.0 | 23.11.2016 | [2018/40] | WO2016US63561 | Priority number, date | US201562260035P | 25.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562260035 P | [2018/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017091709 | Date: | 01.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3381171 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3381171 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L9/32, H04L9/00 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
H04L9/3263 (EP,US);
H04L63/06 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP);
H04L63/101 (EP);
H04L63/126 (EP);
H04L9/007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/40] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINDEUTIGE IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND SICHERE KOMMUNIKATION MIT EINEM GERÄT IN EINEM UNKONTROLLIERTEN NETZWERK | [2018/40] | English: | UNIQUELY IDENTIFYING AND SECURELY COMMUNICATING WITH AN APPLIANCE IN AN UNCONTROLLED NETWORK | [2018/40] | French: | IDENTIFICATION UNIQUE ET COMMUNICATION SÉCURISÉE AVEC UN APPAREIL DANS UN RÉSEAU NON CONTRÔLÉ | [2018/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 24.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2016 | AL | 15.12.2021 | AT | 15.12.2021 | CY | 15.12.2021 | CZ | 15.12.2021 | DK | 15.12.2021 | EE | 15.12.2021 | ES | 15.12.2021 | FI | 15.12.2021 | HR | 15.12.2021 | IT | 15.12.2021 | LT | 15.12.2021 | LV | 15.12.2021 | MC | 15.12.2021 | MK | 15.12.2021 | MT | 15.12.2021 | NL | 15.12.2021 | PL | 15.12.2021 | RO | 15.12.2021 | RS | 15.12.2021 | SE | 15.12.2021 | SI | 15.12.2021 | SK | 15.12.2021 | SM | 15.12.2021 | TR | 15.12.2021 | BG | 15.03.2022 | NO | 15.03.2022 | GR | 16.03.2022 | IS | 15.04.2022 | PT | 18.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
MK | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
TR | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
MK | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 15.12.2021 | |
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 15.12.2021 | |
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 15.12.2021 | |
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 15.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015229629 (ISHAYA VISHVANANDA [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 101 * * claims 1-8, 12 * * the whole document *; | [A]US2012089847 (TU VAN QUY [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 55 - page 7, paragraph 68 * * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2012089847 (TU VAN QUY [CA], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0027], [0029], [0055]-[0068] and figure 3. *; | [A]WO2015080731 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [A] 1-20* See abstract, claims 1-6 and figures 2, 4. *; | [Y]US2015222611 (MOORE JONATHAN [US]) [Y] 6-8, 14, 19 * See paragraphs [0026], [0029], [0032] and figure 4A. *; | [Y]US2015229629 (ISHAYA VISHVANANDA [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0002], [0027], [0032], [0048], [0082], [0101], [0102], [0104] , [0178], claims 1-8, 12 and figure 1. *; | [A]US2015310202 (SONDHI AJAY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See abstract, paragraphs [0078]-[0085] and figures 6-11. * | by applicant | US7111057 | US7376716 | US7472178 | US2012089847 | US8194438 | US8477837 | US2015229629 | US9491145 |