EP3385885 - EYEBALL TRACKING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Unionpay Co., Ltd Cup Tower 36 Hanxiao Rd. Pudong New Area Shanghai 200135 / CN | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAI, Zihao Cup Tower 36 Hanxiao Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200135 / CN | 02 /
FENG, Liang Cup Tower 36 Hanxiao Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200135 / CN | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/41] | Application number, filing date | 16869989.0 | 30.11.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016CN108060 | Priority number, date | CN201510875607 | 02.12.2015 Original published format: CN201510875607 | [2018/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017092679 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3385885 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/80, G06K9/00 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
G06V40/19 (EP,US);
G06V40/18 (CN);
G06T7/248 (US);
G06T7/62 (US);
G06T7/74 (US);
G06V40/193 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/41] | G06K9/80 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR AUGAPFELVERFOLGUNG | [2018/41] | English: | EYEBALL TRACKING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DEVICE | [2018/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SUIVI DE GLOBE OCULAIRE, ET DISPOSITIF | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2018 | Translation filed | 13.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 13.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN104050448 (QINGDAO HISENSE HIVIEW TECH CO) [A] 1,3,11,13,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X] - JAN FARMANULLAH ET AL, "A non-circular iris localization algorithm using image projection function and gray level statistics", OPTIK, (20130901), vol. 124, no. 18, doi:10.1016/J.IJLEO.2012.09.018, ISSN 0030-4026, pages 3187 - 3193, XP028686855 [X] 1-23 * Section 2. and sub-sections * * figures 1-11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijleo.2012.09.018 | [A] - FLOREA LAURA ET AL, "Robust eye centers localization with zero-crossing encoded image projections", PATTERN ANALYSIS AND APPLICATIONS, SPRINGER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 20, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S10044-015-0479-X, ISSN 1433-7541, (20150509), pages 127 - 143, (20150509), XP036142328 [A] 1,2,11,12,21-23 * Section 2.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10044-015-0479-x | [A] - SU YEONG ET AL, "Robust Eye and Pupil Detection Method for Gaze Tracking", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ADVANCED ROBOTIC SYSTEMS, (20130101), doi:10.5772/55520, ISSN 1729-8806, page 1, XP055196011 [A] 1,3,11,13,21-23 * Section 2.1 * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5772/55520 |