EP3384518 - ISOMERIC REAGENT TAGS FOR DIFFERENTIAL MOBILITY SPECTROMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DH Technologies Development PTE. Ltd. 33 Marsiling Industrial Estate Road 3 04-06 Singapore 739256 / SG | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMPBELL, John L. 101 Gollins Drive Milton, Ontario L9T 6J9 / CA | 02 /
LEBLANC, Yves 10 Ballard Crescent Newmarket, Ontario L3X 1S3 / CA | 03 /
LIU, Chang 68 White Lodge Crescent Richmond Hill, Ontario L4C 8Z9 / CA | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/31] |
Former [2018/41] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16870085.4 | 29.11.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016IB57192 | Priority number, date | US201562261073P | 30.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562261073 P | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017093898 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3384518 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3384518 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/58, G01N33/68 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
G01N27/624 (EP,US);
G01N33/58 (EP,US);
G01N33/6848 (EP,US);
H01J49/0045 (US);
G01N2458/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/582 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/41] | H01J49/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOMERE REAGENZIENTAGS FÜR DIFFERENZIELLE MOBILITÄTSSPEKTROMETRIE | [2018/41] | English: | ISOMERIC REAGENT TAGS FOR DIFFERENTIAL MOBILITY SPECTROMETRY | [2018/41] | French: | MARQUEURS DE RÉACTIFS ISOMÉRIQUES POUR SPECTROMÉTRIE DE MOBILITÉ DIFFÉRENTIELLE | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 27.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.05.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 16.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.04.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | LU | 29.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
LU | 29.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014273252 (SMART BRIAN PHILLIP [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * the whole document, in particular paragraphs [0007], [0009], [0044], [0046], [0055], [0057], [0067], [0068], [0085], [0086], [0104], [0195]-[0216]; figures 2-4 * [I] 8,11-15; | [XA] - K KAKEHI ET AL, "3-Aminobenzamide and 3-aminobenzoic acid, tags for capillary electrophoresis of complex carbohydrates with laser-induced fluorescent detection", J CHROMATOGR A, (19991101), vol. 863, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(99)00978-4, pages 205 - 218, XP055593629 [X] 1-4,6-8,14 * the whole document, in particular page 207, section 2.3, first two sentences; paragraph spanning columns on page 210; figures 1-3 * [A] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(99)00978-4 | [XA] - A T MACCARONE ET AL, "Characterization of acyl chain position in unsaturated phosphatidylcholines using differential mobility-mass spectrometry", J LIPID RES, (20140617), vol. 55, no. 8, doi:10.1194/jlr.M046995, pages 1668 - 1677, XP055288295 [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document, in particular abstract; figure 1 * [A] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1194/jlr.M046995 | [X] - T GICHNER ET AL, "Antimutagenicity of three isomers of aminobenzoic acid in Salmonella typhimurium", MUTATION RES, (19940901), vol. 309, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0027-5107(94)90093-0, pages 201 - 210, XP025206992 [X] 6-8,14 * the whole document, in particular page 202, column 1, lines 17-22; page 202, column 2, lines 37-43; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0027-5107(94)90093-0 | [X] - M E Eide, "2-Aminopyridine 3-Aminopyridine 4-Aminopyridine", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20060501), pages 1 - 15, URL: https://www.osha.gov/dts/sltc/methods/partial/pv2143/pv2143.pdf, (20190603), XP055593606 [X] 6-8,14 * the whole document, in particular section 3.2 on page 11 * | International search | [Y]WO2004079334 (SIONEX CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-5, 9-11 * See pages 63-64. *; | [A]US2005208550 (PAPPIN DARRYL J [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * See paragraph [0068]. *; | [A]US2012032073 (RAND KASPER D [FR], et al) [A] 1-23* See paragraphs [0067]-[0098] and figures 1-9. *; | [YA]US2013184181 (PURKAYASTHA SUBHASISH [US], et al) [Y] 1-5, 9-11, 15-18 * See paragraphs [0043], [0111]-[0115], [0164], [0187] and claim 11. * [A] 6-8, 12-14, 19-23; | [Y]US2015129762 (CAMPBELL JOHN LAWRENCE [CA], et al) [Y] 15-18 * See paragraphs [0014], [0024]-[0028], [0040] and figure 1. * | by applicant | US2014273252 | - "3-aminobenzamide and 3-aminobenzoic acid, tags for capillary electrophoresis of complex carbohydrates with laser-induced fluorescent detection", J. Chromatogr. A, (19990000), vol. 863, no. 2, pages 205 - 218 | - "Characterization of acyl chain position in unsaturated phsphatidylcholines using differential mobility mass spectrometry", J. Lipid. Res., (20140000), vol. 55, no. 8, pages l668 - 1677 | - "Antimutagenicity of three isomers of aminobenzoic acid in Salmonella typhimurium", Mutation Res., (19940000), vol. 309, no. 2, pages 201 - 210 | - M E EIDE, 2-Aminopyridine 3-Aminopyridine 4-Aminopyridine |