EP3384941 - POROUS FIBER AND PHOSPHORUS ADSORPTION COLUMN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/41] | PHOSPHORUS ADSORBENT, POROUS FIBER AND PHOSPHORUS ADSORPTION COLUMNS | ||
[2020/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Aishan c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
IWAKAWA, Sari c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
UENO, Yoshiyuki c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/41] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 16870417.9 | 11.11.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016JP83574 | Priority number, date | JP20150232770 | 30.11.2015 Original published format: JP 2015232770 | JP20150232771 | 30.11.2015 Original published format: JP 2015232771 | [2018/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017094478 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3384941 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3384941 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, B01D15/08, B01J20/02, B01J20/06, B01J20/28, B01J20/32, C01F17/00, C01G23/047, B01D15/12 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
B01D15/12 (EP,US);
B01J20/0207 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/3486 (KR);
A61M1/36 (EP,US);
A61M1/3624 (US);
A61M1/3679 (KR);
A61M1/3687 (KR);
B01D15/08 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/0211 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/0277 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/06 (KR,US);
B01J20/28004 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/28023 (KR);
B01J20/28028 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/28057 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/28078 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/3204 (EP,KR,US);
C01F17/247 (KR,US);
C01G23/047 (US);
C01G23/0475 (KR,US);
A61M2202/0057 (KR);
B01J2220/58 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/41] | A61M1/36, B01D15/08, B01J20/02, B01J20/06, B01J20/28, C01F17/00, C01G23/047 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORÖSE FASER UND PHOSPHORADSORPTIONSSÄULE | [2020/26] | English: | POROUS FIBER AND PHOSPHORUS ADSORPTION COLUMN | [2020/26] | French: | FIBRE POREUSE ET COLONNE D'ADSORPTION DE PHOSPHORE | [2020/26] |
Former [2018/41] | PHOSPHORADSORBENS, PORÖSE FASER UND PHOSPHORADSORPTIONSSÄULEN | ||
Former [2018/41] | PHOSPHORUS ADSORBENT, POROUS FIBER AND PHOSPHORUS ADSORPTION COLUMNS | ||
Former [2018/41] | ADSORBANT DE PHOSPHORE, FIBRE POREUSE ET COLONNES D'ADSORPTION DE PHOSPHORE | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2018 | Translation filed | 28.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 28.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20197505.9 / EP3777920 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.11.2016 | AL | 23.12.2020 | AT | 23.12.2020 | CY | 23.12.2020 | CZ | 23.12.2020 | DK | 23.12.2020 | EE | 23.12.2020 | FI | 23.12.2020 | HR | 23.12.2020 | LT | 23.12.2020 | LV | 23.12.2020 | MC | 23.12.2020 | MK | 23.12.2020 | MT | 23.12.2020 | NL | 23.12.2020 | PL | 23.12.2020 | RO | 23.12.2020 | RS | 23.12.2020 | SE | 23.12.2020 | SI | 23.12.2020 | SK | 23.12.2020 | SM | 23.12.2020 | TR | 23.12.2020 | BG | 23.03.2021 | NO | 23.03.2021 | GR | 24.03.2021 | IS | 23.04.2021 | PT | 23.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 11.11.2016 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
MK | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
TR | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 11.11.2016 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
MK | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 11.11.2016 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 11.11.2016 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007149405 (SPITLER TIMOTHY M [US]) [X] 1-4,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [ 0009] * * paragraph [0030]; example II ** claims 10, 11 *; | [X] - P. JEEVANANDAM ET AL, "Synthesis of morphologically controlled lanthanum carbonate particles using ultrasound irradiation", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, GB, (20010101), vol. 11, no. 3, doi:10.1039/b007370i, ISSN 0959-9428, pages 869 - 873, XP055600710 [X] 1-4,13 * Section: "Preparation"; page 869, column right - page 870, column left * * Section: "3 Results"; page 870, column left - column right; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b007370i | International search | [Y]JPS62145024 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [Y] 2, 4, 6, 9-10, 12 * , page 2, upper left column, lines 14 to 18; upper right column, lines 1 to 4; page 4, upper right column, line 19 to lower left column, line 12; page 5, upper right column, lines 3 to 13 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2001340756 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN, et al) [Y] 2, 4, 6, 9-10, 12 * , paragraphs [0025], [0034] & CN 1319565 A *; | [X]JP2006514600 (Altair Nanomaterials Inc.) [X] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0003], [0006], [0047], [0057] to [0058], [0062]; fig. 31 & US 2005/0247628 A1 paragraphs [0002] to [0003], [0006], [0082], [0095] to [0096], [0100]; fig. 31 & US 2004/0161474 A1 & WO 2004/016553 A2 & CN 1688511 A *; | [A]WO2009008480 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* , entire text; all drawings & US 2010/0189679 A1 & EP 2168992 A1 & CN 101687961 A *; | [XY]WO2011125758 (TOMITA PHARMA [JP], et al) [X] 1, 3, 5, 7-8, 11, 13-14 * , paragraphs [0001], [0026], [0033], [0049], [0063] to [0075] & JP 5732676 B2 * [Y] 2, 4, 6, 9-10, 12; | [A]JP2013524949 (The University of North Carolina) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2013/0068690 A1 & WO 2011/133671 A2 * | by applicant | JPS614529 | JP2002102335 | JP2011503119 | - KAZUHIKO ISHIKIRIYAMA et al., JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (19950000), vol. 171, pages 103 - 111 |