EP3386200 - VIDEO ENCODING METHOD, VIDEO ENCODING APPARATUS, VIDEO DECODING METHOD, VIDEO DECODING APPARATUS, PROGRAM, AND VIDEO SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIDA, Takayuki c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
CHONO, Keiichi c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2018/41] | Application number, filing date | 16870421.1 | 14.11.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016JP83681 | Priority number, date | JP20150235525 | 02.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015235525 | [2018/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017094482 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3386200 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/70 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04N19/31 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04N19/103 (US);
H04N19/114 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/124 (EP);
H04N19/136 (BR,US);
H04N19/139 (EP);
H04N19/146 (EP);
H04N19/159 (EP);
H04N19/174 (EP);
H04N19/176 (EP);
H04N19/177 (BR,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/41] | H04N19/31, H04N19/114, H04N19/136, H04N19/177, H04N19/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Title | German: | VIDEOCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, VIDEOCODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VIDEODECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, VIDEODECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, PROGRAMM UND VIDEOSYSTEM | [2018/41] | English: | VIDEO ENCODING METHOD, VIDEO ENCODING APPARATUS, VIDEO DECODING METHOD, VIDEO DECODING APPARATUS, PROGRAM, AND VIDEO SYSTEM | [2018/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE VIDÉO, APPAREIL DE CODAGE VIDÉO, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE VIDÉO, APPAREIL DE DÉCODAGE VIDÉO, PROGRAMME ET SYSTÈME VIDÉO | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2018 | Translation filed | 02.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 27.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.12.2023 | 15.12.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/18] | 22.12.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015010059 (HATTORI SHINOBU [JP], et al) [I] 1,4 * [0013], [0014], [0027], [0079], [0185]-[0192] *; | [XP]WO2016152684 (SONY CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,3,4 * [0001], [0025], [0030], [0033], [0107] * * figure 2 *; | [X] - QUALCOMM, "Dynamic Range Adjustment SEI to enable High Dynamic Range video coding with Backward-Compatible Capability", ITU-T SG16 MEETING; 12-10-2015 - 23-10-2015; GENEVA,, (20150929), no. T13-SG16-C-1027, XP030100746 [X] 1,4 * abstract * * section 1 * * second paragraph of section 3 * * penultimate paragraph on page 7 * | [A] - NACCARI M ET AL, "High dynamic range compatibility information SEI message", 21. JCT-VC MEETING; 19-6-2015 - 26-6-2015; WARSAW; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20150609), no. JCTVC-U0033, XP030117445 [A] 1-4 * second paragraph on page 2 * | [A] - COTTON A ET AL, "BBC's response to CfE for HDR Video Coding (Category 3a)", 112. MPEG MEETING; 22-6-2015 - 26-6-2015; WARSAW; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20150618), no. m36249, XP030064617 [A] 1-4 * section 2.3 * | International search | [Y]JP2008118221 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 5-6, 11-12, 17-18 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0013]; fig. 6 to 7 & US 2008/0101478 A1 paragraphs [0027] to [0028]; fig. 6 to 7 *; | [XY]JP2014534719 (Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corp.) [X] 1, 7, 13, 19-22 * , paragraphs [0033] to [0038], [0049] to [0051]; fig. 2 to 3, 5 & US 2015/0042890 A1 paragraphs [0040] to [0045]; fig. 2 to 3, 5 & WO 2013/059116 A1 & KR 10-2014-0061538 A & CN 103907343 A * [Y] 2, 5-6, 8, 11-12, 14, 17-18; | [A]WO2015111467 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-22 * , entire text & CA 2936313 A *; | [A]WO2015125719 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-22 * , entire text & CA 2939065 A *; | [EX]JP2016195450 (SONY CORP) [EX] 1, 7, 13, 19-22* , paragraphs [0025] to [0034], [0042]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [Y] - "Digital Hoso ni Okeru Eizo Fugoka, Onsei Fugoka Oyobi Tajuka Hoshiki Hyojun Kikaku", Association of Radio Industries and Businesses, (20140731), pages 43 - 44 , 140 to 142 [Y] 2, 5-6, 8, 11-12, 14, 17-18 | [Y] - RAJAN JOSHI et al., "High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC) Screen Content Coding: Draft 4", Joint Collaborative Team on Video Coding (JCT- VC) of ITU-T SG 16 WP 3 and ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29/WG 11 21st Meeting, Warsaw, PL, (20150626), vol. 1, pages 372 - 374, XP055368282 [Y] 6, 12, 18 |