EP3366545 - VERTICAL POSITION ADJUSTMENT DEVICE FOR STEERING WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUROKAWA Yoshifumi c/o NSK Ltd. 78 Toriba-machi Maebashi-shi Gunma 371-8527 / JP | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2018/35] | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 16870812.1 | 02.12.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016JP85878 | Priority number, date | JP20150236862 | 03.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015236862 | [2018/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017094877 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3366545 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3366545 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/184, B62D1/189 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
B62D1/184 (EP,US);
B62D1/189 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2020/13] |
Former [2018/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERTIKALPOSITIONSANPASSUNG FÜR EIN LENKRAD | [2018/35] | English: | VERTICAL POSITION ADJUSTMENT DEVICE FOR STEERING WHEEL | [2018/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE DE POSITION VERTICALE POUR VOLANT DE DIRECTION | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2018 | Translation filed | 24.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 24.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.12.2020 | FR | 31.12.2020 | [2021/49] |
Former [2021/48] | FR | 31.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2579159 (NACAM [FR]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 6 - line 27; figure 9 *; | [A]EP0592278 (ECIA EQUIP COMPOSANTS IND AUTO [FR]) [A] 1* column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 28; figure 3 *; | [A]EP2765057 (NSK LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0035] - [0037]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2015122075 (MIHARA SHIN [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0048] - [0050]; figure 3 * | International search | [A]JPS6332962U (Fuji Kiko Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-9 * , page 5, line 10 to page 7, line 5; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2009073378 (NSK LTD) [A] 1-9 * , abstract; paragraphs [0026] to [0030]; fig. 3 to 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011152872 (NSK LTD) [A] 1-9* , paragraphs [0056] to [0057], [0069]; fig. 4 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2013094305 (NSK LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; fig. 3, 13 & JP 5641057 B2 & US 2014/0210196 A1 entire text & EP 2796342 A1 & CN 103328306 A * |