EP3384370 - MOTION BASED SYSTEMS, APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR IMPLEMENTING 3D CONTROLS USING 2D CONSTRUCTS, USING REAL OR VIRTUAL CONTROLLERS, USING PREVIEW FRAMING, AND BLOB DATA CONTROLLERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quantum Interface, LLC 4900 Spicewood Springs Road Suite 400 Austin, TX 78759 / US | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSEPHSON, Jonathan Quantum Interface LLC. 4900 Spicewood Springs Rd Suite 400 Austin, TX 78759 / US | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Basck Limited 9 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1GE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/41] | Downing, Michael Philip Downing IP Limited Grosvenor House 7 Horseshoe Crescent Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 1LJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16871540.7 | 01.12.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016US64504 | Priority number, date | US201562261803P | 01.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562261803 P | US201562261805P | 01.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562261805 P | US201562261807P | 01.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562261807 P | US201562268332P | 16.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562268332 P | US201662311883P | 22.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662311883 P | US201662382189P | 31.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662382189 P | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017096097 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3384370 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0481, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0482, G06F1/16, G06T19/00, G06F3/01, G02B27/01, G06F3/023, H04M1/725, G06F3/0488 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
G06F3/013 (EP);
G06F3/017 (EP);
G06F3/0236 (EP);
G06F3/0482 (EP);
G06F3/04842 (EP);
G06F3/04847 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/41] | G06F3/0481, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0482, G06F1/16, G06T19/00, G06F3/01, G02B27/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Title | German: | BEWEGUNGSBASIERTE SYSTEME, VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG VON 3D-STEUERUNGEN MITTELS 2D-KONSTRUKTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON REALEN ODER VIRTUELLEN STEUERGERÄTEN, MITHILFE EINES VORSCHAURAHMENS, UND BLOBDATENSTEUERGERÄTE | [2018/41] | English: | MOTION BASED SYSTEMS, APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR IMPLEMENTING 3D CONTROLS USING 2D CONSTRUCTS, USING REAL OR VIRTUAL CONTROLLERS, USING PREVIEW FRAMING, AND BLOB DATA CONTROLLERS | [2018/41] | French: | SYSTÈMES BASÉS SUR LE MOUVEMENT, APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR IMPLÉMENTER DES COMMANDES 3D EN UTILISANT DES CONSTRUCTIONS 2D, UTILISATION D'ORGANES DE COMMANDE RÉELS OU VIRTUELS, UTILISATION DE TRAMAGE D'APERÇU, ET ORGANES DE COMMANDE DE DONNÉES DE BLOB | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 14.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2021 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 24.01.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2020 | 31.12.2022 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014129990 (XIN MIN [CA], et al) [X] 1,4,10,11,13 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0213] * * figures 1-37 * [I] 2,3,5-7; | [A]US2014298268 (KANG NAM-WOOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0274] ** figures 1-24 *; | [I]US2015135132 (JOSEPHSON JONATHAN [US]) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0142] * * figures 1-6 * | International search | [Y]US2012036476 (OH EUI JIN [KR]) [Y] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0010]-[0011], [0033], [0043], [0052], [0065]; and figures 1-4, 9. *; | [A]US2012326961 (BROMER NICHOLAS S [US]) [A] 1-31 * See paragraph [0080]; and figure 1. *; | [XY]WO2013180966 (KOPIN CORP [US]) [X] 26-31 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0011], [0021]-[0025], [0048]; claim 12; and figures 1, 4A-4B. * [Y] 1-25; | [A]US2013335301 (WONG ADRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-31* See paragraph [0092];and figure 6. *; | [A]US2014168056 (SWAMINATHAN ASHWIN [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * See paragraph [0015]; and figure 11. * | by applicant | US2014129990 | US2014298268 | US2015135132 |