EP3236387 - BIOLOGICAL DETECTION DEVICE AND PROCESSING METHOD FOR THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Goodix Technology Co., Ltd. Floor 13, Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOU, Lyu Floor 13 Phase B Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Freetrade Zone Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Shengbin Floor 13 Phase B Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Freetrade Zone Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16871745.2 | 08.07.2016 | [2017/43] | WO2016CN89440 | Priority number, date | CN20161027073 | 14.01.2016 Original published format: CN201610027073 | [2017/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017121082 | Date: | 20.07.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3236387 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, H01L31/16, G06K9/20 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
H01L31/16 (EP,US);
G06V40/10 (KR);
G06V40/1318 (EP,CN,US);
G06V10/143 (EP,US);
G06V10/147 (CN);
G06V40/1329 (EP,KR,US);
G06V40/1394 (EP,CN,US);
G06V40/40 (CN);
G06V40/70 (CN);
H01L27/14678 (US);
H01L27/14685 (US);
H01L31/02002 (US);
H01L31/02327 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/43] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCHE NACHWEISVORRICHTUNG UND VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2017/43] | English: | BIOLOGICAL DETECTION DEVICE AND PROCESSING METHOD FOR THE SAME | [2017/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION BIOLOGIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2017 | Translation filed | 12.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 12.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 19.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.03.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN104239869 (WUHAN WONHERE MECHANICAL AND ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-16* paragraps 22-38, figures 1-8 *; | [I]WO2015077733 (SHENZHEN HUIDING TECHNOLOGY CO [CN], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs 4, 10, 73, 86, 88, 89, 94, 96; figures 11A-B * | International search | [Y]CN1875370 (AUTHENTEC INC [US]) [Y] 1, 2, 8, 9, 11-13, 21 * description, page 2, the last paragraph to page 9, paragraph 4, and figures 1-30 *; | [A]US2010208952 (WU JEW-CHIEH [TW]) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [A]CN104050445 (NANCHANG OUFEI BIOLOGY IDENTIFICATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [Y]CN104239869 (WUHAN WONHERE MECHANICAL AND ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1, 2, 8, 9, 11-13, 21 * description, paragraphs [0022]-[0038], and figures 1-8 *; | [A]CN104616001 (SHANGHAI LUOJI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]CN105117697 (NANCHANG OUFEI BIOLOGY IDENTIFICATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document * |