EP3387713 - A COAXIAL CABLE CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teleste Oyj Telestenkatu 1 20660 Littoinen / FI | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOTHERSDALE, Keith 17 Gooselands Rathmell Settle Yorkshire BD240LT / GB | 02 /
GRIBBY, Steve 34 Sea Grove Avenue Hayling Island Hampshire PO11 9EU / GB | 03 /
ALBRICHT, Arno Rossiniweg 48 3906 CG Veenendaal / NL | 04 /
WINANDY, Nicolas Rue des Bayards 109 BE-4000 Liège / BE | 05 /
WILKINS, Robert 10 Dale Way Leyburn Yorkshire DL8 5LE / GB | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Berggren Oy, Tampere Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 16872473.0 | 08.12.2016 | [2018/42] | WO2016FI50857 | Priority number, date | EP20150397541 | 09.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15397541 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017098085 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3387713 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 15.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/05, // H02G15/184 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
H01R9/0524 (EP,US);
H01R13/5205 (US);
H01R9/0518 (US);
H01R9/0521 (US);
H02G15/184 (EP,US);
H01R2103/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | H01R9/05, H01R13/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Title | German: | KOAXIALKABELSTECKER | [2018/42] | English: | A COAXIAL CABLE CONNECTOR | [2018/42] | French: | CONNECTEUR DE CÂBLE COAXIAL | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 08.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005164553 (MONTENA NOAH [US]) [A] 1 * figure 5 *; | [Y]US2005181652 (MONTENA NOAH [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0023] *; | [Y]US2009170360 (SHAW GLEN DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 8 * figures 18-19 *; | [A]US2011065317 (SHAW GLEN DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 16-20 *; | [Y]EP2400596 (PPC A DIVISION OF JOHN MEZZALINGUA ASSOCIATES INC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0 39] , [0 41] *; | [A]EP2595255 (SONDEX WIRELINE LTD [GB]) [A] 1* figure 1 * | International search | [X]US2005164553 (MONTENA NOAH [US]) [X] 1, 2, 4, 5, 7 * paragraphs [0043] & [0049]-[0053]; figures 8 & 16-19 *; | [X]US2011065317 (SHAW GLEN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1, 3, 6, 8, 9 * paragraphs [0085] & [0092]-[0102]; figures 16-24 *; | [A]EP2400596 (PPC A DIVISION OF JOHN MEZZALINGUA ASSOCIATES INC [US]) [A] 1-5* paragraphs [0035]-[0042]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | US2005181652 | US2011065317 | EP2400596 |