EP3378276 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USER EQUIPMENT STATE CONFIGURATIONS FOR MULTIPLE SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RONG, Lu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
MA, Jianglei 3 Bon Echo Crescent Ottawa Ontario K2M 2W5 / CA | 03 /
ZHU, Peiying 303 Terry Fox Drive Suite 400 Ottawa Ontario K2K 3J1 / CA | 04 /
TONG, Wen 12 Whitestone Drive Ottawa Ontario K2C 4A7 / CA | 05 /
AU, Kelvin Kar Kin 233 Tandalee Crescent Kanata Ontario K2M 0A2 / CA | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 16872524.0 | 08.12.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016IB57457 | Priority number, date | US201562264629P | 08.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562264629 P | US201662296911P | 18.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662296911 P | US201615356124 | 18.11.2016 Original published format: US201615356124 | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017098442 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3378276 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/27, // H04W88/02, H04W52/02 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
H04W76/27 (EP);
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W52/0229 (EP);
H04W88/02 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR BENUTZERAUSRÜSTUNGSZUSTANDSKONFIGURATIONEN FÜR MEHRERE DIENSTE | [2018/39] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USER EQUIPMENT STATE CONFIGURATIONS FOR MULTIPLE SERVICES | [2018/39] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DES CONFIGURATIONS D'ÉTAT D'ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR POUR DE MULTIPLES SERVICES | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 20.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]US2015195788 (AU KELVIN [CA], et al) [XD] 1,10,11,14 * paragraphs [0030] - [0037] - [0 63] - [0072] * [Y] 2-9,12,13; | [Y]US8930965 (SHALEV TAL [IL], et al) [Y] 2-4,6-9,12,13 * column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 8 * * column 3, lines 4-10,47-57 * * page 4, lines 4-48 * * column 6, lines 38-39 *; | [Y]US2014064160 (VERGER LUCIANO M [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0059] - [0061] - [0071] - [0073] * | International search | [X]CN104125347 (BEIJING XIAOMI TECHNOLOGY CO) [X] 1-28 * paragraphs [0105]-[0112], [0119]-[0182] in description *; | [A]CN101426258 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013091552 (CHENG CHING-WEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document * |