EP3388425 - AMINOAZOLE DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSODA, Shinnosuke c/o Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | 02 /
UNOKI, Gen c/o Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Hidekazu c/o Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | 04 /
SASAKI, Kosuke c/o Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | 05 /
SHIBATA, Jun c/o Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | 06 /
YOKOYAMA, Emi c/o Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | 07 /
HORIE, Kyohei c/o Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | 08 /
TAKAGI, Kenichiro c/o Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 16873130.5 | 09.12.2016 | [2018/42] | WO2016JP86784 | Priority number, date | JP20150242065 | 11.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015242065 | [2018/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017099237 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3388425 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3388425 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/48, C07D277/56, C07C335/12, A61K31/421, A61K31/422, A61K31/4245, A61K31/426, A61K31/427, A61K31/428, A61K31/433, A61K31/4439, A61K31/454, A61K31/4709, A61K31/4725, A61K31/497, A61K31/498, A61K31/501, A61K31/5377, A61P21/00, A61P21/04, A61P43/00 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
C07D277/56 (EP,US);
C07D277/38 (KR);
A61K31/421 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/422 (EP,US);
A61K31/4245 (EP,US);
A61K31/426 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61K31/428 (EP,US);
A61K31/433 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4725 (EP,US);
A61K31/497 (EP,US);
A61K31/498 (EP,US);
A61K31/501 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (KR);
A61P21/04 (KR);
A61P5/26 (EP,US);
C07C335/12 (EP,US);
C07C335/18 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D263/48 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | C07D263/48, A61K31/421, A61K31/422, A61K31/4245, A61K31/426, A61K31/427, A61K31/428, A61K31/433, A61K31/4439, A61K31/454, A61K31/4709, A61K31/4725, A61K31/497, A61K31/498, A61K31/501, A61K31/5377, A61P21/00, A61P21/04, A61P43/00, C07C335/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Extension states | BA | 27.03.2018 | ME | 27.03.2018 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMINOAZOLDERIVAT | [2018/42] | English: | AMINOAZOLE DERIVATIVE | [2018/42] | French: | DÉRIVÉ D'AMINOAZOLE | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2018 | Translation filed | 27.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 27.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2016 | AL | 05.08.2020 | AT | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | CZ | 05.08.2020 | DK | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | ES | 05.08.2020 | FI | 05.08.2020 | HR | 05.08.2020 | IT | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | MK | 05.08.2020 | MT | 05.08.2020 | NL | 05.08.2020 | PL | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | RS | 05.08.2020 | SE | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | SM | 05.08.2020 | TR | 05.08.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | NO | 05.11.2020 | GR | 06.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | PT | 07.12.2020 | IE | 09.12.2020 | LU | 09.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 09.12.2016 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MK | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 09.12.2020 | ||
LU | 09.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.12.2016 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 09.12.2020 | ||
LU | 09.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 09.12.2020 | ||
LU | 09.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 09.12.2020 | ||
LU | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2004041277 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [I] 1-10,12-14 * claims 1, 4, 18 * [A] 11; | [A]US2009036419 (CHEN WEIRONG [US], et al) [A] 1-14* scheme V; page 95 * | International search | [A]JPH0680653 (BAYER AG) [A] 1-15 * , entire text & US 5256632 A & EP 0569810 A1 & DE 4215878 A *; | [A]JPH0940607 (ZENECA LTD) [A] 1-15 * , entire text & US 5834468 A & US 6057345 A & US 2003/0139418 A1 & EP 0752421 A1 *; | [A]WO9815530 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text & JP 2000-159749 A & US 6166219 A & US 6352985 B1 & WO 1997/024334 A1 & EP 0882718 A1 *; | [A]WO9900359 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text & US 6242474 B1 & EP 1000932 A1 *; | [A]WO9900373 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text & US 6420409 B1 & EP 1020452 A1 & AU 7934698 A & CN 1268123 A & KR 10-2001-0014166 A *; | [A]JP2005537333 (Novo Nordisk A/S) [A] 1-15 * , entire text & US 2003/0138416 A1 & US 2004/0122235 A1 & US 2008/0119454 A1 & US 2008/0119455 A1 & US 2006/0183783 A1 & US 2011/0301158 A1 & WO 2004/002481 A1 & WO 2003/047626 A1 & EP 1453541 A1 & EP 1531815 A1 & EP 2471533 A1 & CN 1678311 A *; | [A]WO2006114274 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text & JP 2008-539183 A & US 2008/0207708 A1 & EP 1874776 A1 *; | [A]JP2007302617 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [A] 1-15 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2009513563 (Xenon Pharmaceuticals Inc.) [A] 1-15 * , entire text & US 2010/0152187 A1 & US 2013/0096056 A1 & WO 2007/130075 A1 & EP 2029138 A1 & EP 2540296 A1 & CA 2618646 A & CN 101208089 A *; | [A]WO2010012793 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2010018714 (MITSUI CHEMICALS AGRO INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text & JP 2013-256522 A & US 2011/0201687 A1 & US 2013/0231392 A1 & US 2013/0310459 A1 & US 2011/0137068 A1 & US 2014/0296560 A1 & US 2016/0297750 A1 & WO 2010/018857 A1 & EP 2319830 A1 & EP 2322502 A1 & KR 10-2011-0039370 A & CN 102119143 A *; | [A]WO2014017093 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text & JP 2015-178458 A *; | [A]JP2015516437 (Abbvie Inc.) [A] 1-15 * , entire text & US 2014/0336167 A1 & US 2016/0193209 A1 & WO 2013/170118 A1 & EP 2850081 A1 & CA 2870566 A & CN 104271572 A *; | [A] - MARUGAN JUAN J. et al., "Evaluation of 2- thioxo-2,3,5,6,7,8-hexahydropyrimido[4,5-d] pyrimidin-4(1H)-one analogues as GAA activators", European Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, (20100000), vol. 45, no. 5, pages 1880 - 1897, XP026976508 [A] 1-15 |