EP3365609 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING TEMPERATURE IN AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YI, Daeeun 214-1001 24 Jungdae-ro Songpa-gu Seoul 05834 / KR | 02 /
OH, Seong Hwan 303-1004 11 Sinchon-ro 47beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16904 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Kyungjae 10-702 316 Dongsuwon-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16546 / KR | 04 /
SEO, Jeongil 112-303 22 Dongjak-daero 39-gil Dongjak-gu Seoul 06993 / KR | 05 /
SONG, Kwanwoo 208-401 184 Seongbok 2-ro Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16809 / KR | 06 /
CHO, Hyejung 802-1103 57 Dongan-ro Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14074 / KR | 07 /
KANG, Jae Eun 203-1402 25 Gwonseon-ro 694beon-gil Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16567 / KR | 08 /
KIM, Chang-Han 302 28-44 Jungang-ro 64beon-gil Deogyang-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 10539 / KR | 09 /
RYU, Jongyoub 103-302 55 Gwongwang-ro Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16582 / KR | 10 /
LEE, Changhyun 6306-601 60 Central park-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16504 / KR | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2018/35] | Application number, filing date | 16873404.4 | 09.12.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016KR14486 | Priority number, date | KR20150176062 | 10.12.2015 Original published format: KR 20150176062 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017099539 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3365609 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00, F24F11/30, F24F11/80, F24F110/10, F24F110/12, F24F120/10, F24F130/00, F24F130/10, F24F11/62, F24F130/20, F24F11/77, F24F11/83 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F11/83 (EP,US);
F24F11/62 (EP,US);
F24F11/64 (EP,US);
F24F11/77 (EP,US);
F24F11/80 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (US);
F24F11/46 (EP,US);
F24F11/61 (EP,US);
F24F11/63 (EP,US);
F24F2110/10 (EP,US);
F24F2110/12 (EP,US);
F24F2120/10 (EP,US);
F24F2130/00 (EP,US);
F24F2130/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/35] | F24F11/00, F24F11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR TEMPERATURREGELUNG IN EINER KLIMAANLAGE | [2018/35] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING TEMPERATURE IN AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM | [2018/35] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE CLIMATISATION | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 22.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8369994 (ROSEN HOWARD [CA]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]WO2015089295 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2015285527 (KIM KYUNG-JAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0017] - [0 25] - [0028] - [0 89] - [0092]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]KR20150131913 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [A]US2012042674 (TAKENAKA NAOFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0011]-[0012], [0072]-[0123]; and figures 8-19. *; | [A]US2012072030 (ELLIOTT SCOTT [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0014]; and figure 11. *; | [Y]US2014041848 (KATO YOHEI [JP], et al) [Y] 4-5, 14-5 * See paragraphs [0010]-[0105]; and figures 1-4. *; | [A]US2014150483 (TAKAYAMA KEISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0007]-[0013], [0057]-[0133]; and figures 1-8. *; | [XY]WO2014123531 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1-3, 6-13 * See page 1, line 3 - page 49, line 24; and figures 1-5, 7-9. * [Y] 4-5, 14-15 |