EP3387611 - A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR MONITORING HEALTHCARE GARMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Healthtextiles I Sverige AB Timmermansgatan 2 802 66 Gävle / SE | [2021/41] |
Former [2018/42] | For all designated states Healthtextiles I Sverige AB Timmermansgatan 2 802 66 Gävle / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERSSON, Tomas Trödjevägen 49 805 96 Gävle / SE | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 16873466.3 | 08.12.2016 | [2018/42] | WO2016SE51230 | Priority number, date | SE20150051631 | 11.12.2015 Original published format: SE 1551631 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017099658 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3387611 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3387611 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/24, A61B5/01, G16H40/63, G16H40/67, G16H40/20 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
A61B5/6804 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G08B21/24 (SE,US);
G06Q50/22 (IL);
A61B5/0008 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61B5/01 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61B5/746 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G16H40/20 (EP,US);
G16H40/40 (SE,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/33] | G06Q50/22, G08B21/24, A61B5/01, G16H40/63, G16H40/67, G16H40/20 | ||
Former IPC [2018/42] | G06Q50/22, G08B21/24, A61B5/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON GESUNDHEITSBEKLEIDUNG | [2018/42] | English: | A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR MONITORING HEALTHCARE GARMENTS | [2018/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER DES VÊTEMENTS DE SOINS DE SANTÉ | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 19.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2016 | AL | 13.10.2021 | AT | 13.10.2021 | CY | 13.10.2021 | CZ | 13.10.2021 | DK | 13.10.2021 | EE | 13.10.2021 | FI | 13.10.2021 | HR | 13.10.2021 | IT | 13.10.2021 | LT | 13.10.2021 | LV | 13.10.2021 | MC | 13.10.2021 | MK | 13.10.2021 | MT | 13.10.2021 | NL | 13.10.2021 | RO | 13.10.2021 | RS | 13.10.2021 | SE | 13.10.2021 | SI | 13.10.2021 | SK | 13.10.2021 | SM | 13.10.2021 | TR | 13.10.2021 | IE | 08.12.2021 | LU | 08.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | BG | 13.01.2022 | NO | 13.01.2022 | GR | 14.01.2022 | IS | 13.02.2022 | PT | 14.02.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 08.12.2016 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
MK | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
TR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 08.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 08.12.2016 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
MK | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 08.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 08.12.2016 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 08.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 08.12.2016 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 08.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 08.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 08.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 13.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2011072837 (ITRONIK INTERCONNECT LTD [IE], et al) [I] 1-9* summary, p.3 l.15 - p.4 l.6, p.10 l.4-13, p.11 l.1-2 * | International search | [X]WO2011072837 (ITRONIK INTERCONNECT LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1-12 * ; abstract; page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 4; page 10, line 4 - page 11, line 2 *; | [A]US2012218123 (JI LUSHENG [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * , abstract *; | [A]WO2013006644 (SAUDI ARABIAN OIL CO [SA], et al) [A] 1-12 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0005]-[0029] *; | [A] - "Standardization for Smart Clothing Technology", Network and Parallel Computing;, (20090719), XP047386103 [A] 1-12 * doi:1 0.1007/978-3-642-02580-8_84; abstract; section 4 (Case Study) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-02580-8_84 | by applicant | WO2011072837 |