EP3384475 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CONVERSATIONAL ADJUSTMENT BASED ON USER'S COGNITIVE STATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/41] | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CONVERSATIONAL ADJUSTMENT BASED ON USER'S COGNITIVE STATE AND/OR SITUATIONAL STATE | ||
[2021/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cerence Operating Company 15 Wayside Road Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2021/11] |
Former [2019/41] | For all designated states Nuance Communications, Inc. 1 Wayside Road Burlington, MA 01803 / US | ||
Former [2018/41] | For all designated states VoiceBox Technologies Corporation 1110 112th Avenue NE, Suite 500 Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Philip, R. 137 Fisher King Lane Deer Harbor, WA 98243 / US | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Potter, Julian Mark WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [2018/41] | Application number, filing date | 16873660.1 | 06.12.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016US65089 | Priority number, date | US201562263682P | 06.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562263682 P | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017100167 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3384475 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3384475 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/22, G08B21/06, G10L15/00, G10L15/06, G10L15/065, G10L15/08, G10L15/18, G10L25/63, G06F3/01, G06F3/16, // B60R16/037 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
G10L15/22 (EP,US);
G06F3/012 (US);
G06F3/013 (EP,US);
G06F3/167 (EP);
G10L25/63 (EP,US);
B60R16/0373 (EP,US);
G10L15/1815 (EP,US);
G10L2015/223 (EP,US);
G10L2015/227 (EP,US);
G10L2015/228 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/47] | G10L15/22, G08B21/06, G10L15/00, G10L15/06, G10L15/065, G10L15/08, G10L15/18, G10L25/63, G06F3/01, // B60R16/037 | ||
Former IPC [2018/41] | G08B21/06, G10L15/00, G10L15/06, G10L15/065, G10L15/08, G10L15/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONVERSATIONSANPASSUNG AUF DER GRUNDLAGE DES KOGNITIVEN ZUSTANDS DES BENUTZERS | [2021/31] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CONVERSATIONAL ADJUSTMENT BASED ON USER'S COGNITIVE STATE | [2021/31] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AJUSTEMENT DE CONVERSATIONS SUR LA BASE DE L'ÉTAT COGNITIF D'UN UTILISATEUR | [2021/31] |
Former [2018/41] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONVERSATIONSANPASSUNG AUF DER GRUNDLAGE DES KOGNITIVEN ZUSTANDS DES BENUTZERS UND/ODER SITUATIONSBEDINGTEN ZUSTANDS | ||
Former [2018/41] | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CONVERSATIONAL ADJUSTMENT BASED ON USER'S COGNITIVE STATE AND/OR SITUATIONAL STATE | ||
Former [2018/41] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AJUSTEMENT DE CONVERSATIONS SUR LA BASE DE L'ÉTAT COGNITIF D'UN UTILISATEUR ET/OU DE L'ÉTAT SITUATIONNEL | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 24.01.2019 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 05.03.2019 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 06.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.04.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2016 | AL | 22.12.2021 | AT | 22.12.2021 | CY | 22.12.2021 | CZ | 22.12.2021 | DK | 22.12.2021 | EE | 22.12.2021 | ES | 22.12.2021 | FI | 22.12.2021 | HR | 22.12.2021 | IT | 22.12.2021 | LT | 22.12.2021 | LV | 22.12.2021 | MC | 22.12.2021 | MK | 22.12.2021 | MT | 22.12.2021 | NL | 22.12.2021 | PL | 22.12.2021 | RO | 22.12.2021 | RS | 22.12.2021 | SE | 22.12.2021 | SI | 22.12.2021 | SK | 22.12.2021 | SM | 22.12.2021 | TR | 22.12.2021 | BG | 22.03.2022 | NO | 22.03.2022 | GR | 23.03.2022 | IS | 22.04.2022 | PT | 22.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 06.12.2016 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
MK | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
TR | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 06.12.2016 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MK | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 06.12.2016 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.12.2016 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 22.12.2021 | |
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 22.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005267759 (JESCHKE BAERBEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,9-14 * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0018] , [0022] , [0025] , [0026] , [0028] , [0045] , [0047] , [0049] , [0051] , [0060] , [0070] * * figure 2 * [Y] 5,15; | [X]DE102014002543 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1,6-8,11 * paragraphs [0005] , [0013] - [0015] - [0019] , [0020] , [0054] *; | [X]US2015095037 (SHIMIZU ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0040] , [0069] , [0072] , [0073] , [0082] , [0083] *; | [X]US2008071547 (PRIETO RAMON [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0071] , [0085] - [0102] *; | [X]US2006106615 (TATEISHI MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0016] , [0100] - [0104] - [0124] , [0125] *; | [Y]US6236968 (KANEVSKY DIMITRI [US], et al) [Y] 5,15 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 13 * | International search | [Y]US2003181822 (VICTOR TRENT [SE]) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US9085303 (WOLVERTON MICHAEL J [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US6236968 (KANEVSKY DIMITRI [US], et al) [Y] 5,15 * entire document *; | [A]US9196248 (FISCHER HANS-PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2015276424 (KWON OH-WOOG [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US8311827 (HERNANDEZ RUBEN SAN-SEGUNDO [ES], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US9123345 (KHANNA RAHUL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US7437488 (ITO TAKAFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US6598018 (JUNQUA JEAN-CLAUDE [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US8140335 (KENNEWICK MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2013030811 (OLLEON JULES [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US8214219 (PRIETO RAMON [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US8862317 (SHIN HYUN SOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document * | Examination | EP3057091 | by applicant | DE102014002543 | EP3057091 |