EP3387653 - SILVER CONDUCTIVE PASTE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Chemical Corporation 35 Waterview Boulevard Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOYER, Jerome 1 Avenue at Port Imperial Apt. 1345 West New York, NJ 07073 / US | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 16873886.2 | 09.12.2016 | [2018/42] | WO2016US65738 | Priority number, date | US201562265461P | 10.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562265461 P | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017100516 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3387653 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/22, H01B1/16, H01L31/0224, C03C8/18, C03C3/14, C03C8/10, C01B19/00 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
C03C8/18 (EP,US);
C01B19/004 (EP,US);
C03C3/142 (EP,US);
C03C8/02 (US);
C03C8/10 (EP,US);
H01B1/16 (EP,US);
H01B1/22 (EP,US);
H01L29/456 (US);
H01L31/022425 (US);
C03C2204/00 (US);
C03C2209/00 (US);
C03C4/14 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | H01B1/20, H01B1/22, C01G15/00, C01B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Title | German: | SILBERLEITPASTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2018/42] | English: | SILVER CONDUCTIVE PASTE COMPOSITION | [2018/42] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PÂTE CONDUCTRICE À L'ARGENT | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 08.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 24.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5076876 (DIETZ RAYMOND L [US]) [X] 1-7,10,11,16-20 * Glass compositions M86,M90-M93; column 6, lines 35-62; claims 1,9,11; table 1 * [Y] 13,14 [I] 8,9,12,15; | [XYI]US4933030 (DIETZ RAYMOND L [US]) [X] 1-7,10,11,16-20 * Glass compositions M86,M90-M93; column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 20; claims 9-11; table 1 * [Y] 13,14 [I] 8,9,12,15; | [IAY]US2013277624 (YANG YI [US], et al) [I] 1-7,11,12,16-20 * paragraph [0034]; figures 2,3; claims 1,23,26,27 * [A] 8-10,15 [Y] 13,14; | [IAY]US2015072463 (YANG YI [US], et al) [I] 1-7,11-13,16-20 * paragraphs [0055] , [0058] , [0075] , [0080] , [0099]; table 5 * [A] 8-10,15 [Y] 14; | [YA]US2014287583 (LIU XIAOLI [CN], et al) [Y] 13,14 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012]; claim 1 * [A] 1-12,15-20; | [E]EP3329517 (SUN CHEMICAL CORP [US]) [E] 1-13,15-20 * paragraphs [0028] , [0035] - [0037]; claim -; table 2 * | International search | [X]US2013277624 (YANG YI [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * para [0033], [0034], [0053], [0055], [0085], [0088] *; | [X]US2015072463 (YANG YI [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * para [0058], [0074], [0075], [0082], [0084], [0088], [0097] *; | [X]US4933030 (DIETZ RAYMOND L [US]) [X] 1-3 * col 4, I 43-44; col 6, I 19; col 6, I 65-68; col 13, Table 1 *; | [XE]US2016369111 (MOYER JEROME G [US], et al) [XE] 1-3 * the entire document *; | [Y]WO2015024990 (VISPA S R L [IT]) [Y] 1-3 * the entire document *; | [Y]US5336644 (AKHTAR MASYOOD [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * the entire document * |