EP3390695 - HIGH PRESSURE ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AquaHydrex Pty Ltd 56 Montague Street North Wollongong, NSW 2500 / AU | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SWIEGERS, Gerhard Frederick 1797 Boxelder Street Louisville, CO 80027 / US | 02 /
KLOOS, Steven Duwayne 1448 Briergate Drive Naperville Illinois 60563 / US | 03 /
BARRETT, Paul Brendan Denis Michael 12 Campbell Street Woonona NewSouth Wales 2517 / AU | [2019/15] |
Former [2018/43] | 01 /
SWIEGERS, Gerhard Frederick 56 Montague Street North Wollongong New South Wales 2500 / AU | ||
02 /
KLOOS, Steven Duwayne 1448 Briergate Drive Naperville Illinois 60563 / US | |||
03 /
BARRETT, Paul Brendan Denis Michael 12 Campbell Street Woonona NewSouth Wales 2517 / AU | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 16874137.9 | 14.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016AU51235 | Priority number, date | AU20150905154 | 14.12.2015 Original published format: AU 2015905154 | AU20150905155 | 14.12.2015 Original published format: AU 2015905155 | AU20150905156 | 14.12.2015 Original published format: AU 2015905156 | AU20150905158 | 14.12.2015 Original published format: AU 2015905158 | AU20150905160 | 14.12.2015 Original published format: AU 2015905160 | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017100846 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3390695 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/12, C25B11/03, H01M4/80, H01M8/04089 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
C25B11/03 (EP,US);
C25B11/031 (EP,US);
C25B1/04 (EP,US);
C25B11/091 (EP,US);
C25B15/00 (EP,US);
C25B15/02 (EP,US);
C25B15/08 (EP,US);
C25B9/17 (EP,US);
C25B9/70 (EP,US);
H01M4/8626 (US);
H01M4/9016 (US);
H01M4/94 (EP,US);
H01M8/04276 (US);
H01M8/186 (US);
H01M8/24 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHE HOCHDRUCKZELLE | [2018/43] | English: | HIGH PRESSURE ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL | [2018/43] | French: | CELLULE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE HAUTE PRESSION | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 12.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015292094 (SWIEGERS GERHARD FREDERICK [AU], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *[I] 13 | International search | [X]US4048383 (CLIFFORD JOHN E) [X] 1-8, 11-14, 17-24 * column 3 line 15-column 4 line 60; column 7, lines 46-64; column 8 lines 49-55; column 9, lines 40-43; column 12, line 1 - 29; column 17, lines 6-28; column 20, lines 4-10; column 25, lines 18-23; claim 12; example 1; example 6. *; | [X]US2009000574 (SUGIMASA MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1, 5-13, 19-22* paragraphs [0013]-[0014], [0035] and [0043]; figures 1 and 3; Claims 1 and 5. *; | [X]WO2015013764 (AQUAHYDREX PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1, 2, 5-10, 14-16 and 19-22 * abstract, paragraphs [035], [046], [047], [053], [064], [072], [0102], [0125] [0203], [0237]-[0240]; examples 7 and 8. *; | [A] - GILLESPIE, M. I. et al., "Performance evaluation of a membraneless divergent electrode-flow-through (DEFT) alkaline electrolyser based on optimisation of electrolytic flow and electrode gap.", Journal of Power Sources, (20151020), vol. 293, pages 228 - 235, XP055246190 [A] 2-4 * . Second column, page 231-233, section 3.2 "Effect of the variation in electrode gap and electrolytic flow velocity", first and final paragraphs; Figures 4a, 4b and 5. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2015.05.077 |