EP3392226 - MAGNESIUM ALUMINUM SPINEL BRICK PREPARATION METHOD AND MAGNESIUM ALUMINUM SPINEL BRICK PREPARED USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zibo City Luzhong Refractories Co., Ltd. Niecun Luocun Zichuan District Zibo, Shandong 255138 / CN | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Junhong No. 30 Xueyuan Road Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | 02 /
FENG, Jisheng Niecun Luocun Zichuan District Zibo Shandong 255138 / CN | 03 /
JIA, Yuanping Niecun Luocun Zichuan District Zibo Shandong 255138 / CN | 04 /
WU, Yanxia No. 1 Xiyuan Road Jianxi District Luoyang Henan 471039 / CN | 05 /
ZHU, Bo Niecun Luocun Zichuan District Zibo Shandong 255138 / CN | 06 /
GUO, Yutao Niecun Luocun Zichuan District Zibo Shandong 255138 / CN | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2020/23] |
Former [2018/43] | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16874884.6 | 16.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016CN110249 | Priority number, date | CN201510936752 | 16.12.2015 Original published format: CN201510936752 | [2018/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017101827 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3392226 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3392226 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/66, B32B18/00, C04B35/043, C04B35/05, C04B35/20, C04B35/443, C04B35/626, C04B35/634 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
C04B35/66 (EP,CN);
C04B35/443 (EP,CN);
C04B37/008 (US);
B28B3/00 (US);
C04B35/043 (EP);
C04B35/0435 (EP);
C04B35/05 (EP);
C04B35/20 (EP,CN);
C04B35/622 (CN);
C04B35/62655 (EP);
C04B35/63404 (EP);
C04B2235/3272 (CN);
C04B2235/3427 (CN);
C04B2235/5427 (EP);
C04B2235/602 (EP);
C04B2235/77 (CN);
C04B2235/96 (CN);
C04B2235/9607 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | C04B35/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR MAGNESIUM-ALUMINIUM-SPINELL-ZIEGELSTEIN UND UNTER VERWENDUNG DAVON HERGESTELLTER MAGNESIUM-ALUMINIUM-SPINELL-ZIEGELSTEIN | [2018/43] | English: | MAGNESIUM ALUMINUM SPINEL BRICK PREPARATION METHOD AND MAGNESIUM ALUMINUM SPINEL BRICK PREPARED USING SAME | [2018/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE BRIQUE EN SPINELLE DE MAGNÉSIUM ET D'ALUMINIUM ET BRIQUE EN SPINELLE DE MAGNÉSIUM ET D'ALUMINIUM PRÉPARÉE À L'AIDE DE CELUI-CI | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2002 | Translation filed | 23.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 23.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.05.2020 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.06.2020 | CY | 03.06.2020 | DK | 03.06.2020 | EE | 03.06.2020 | FI | 03.06.2020 | HR | 03.06.2020 | LT | 03.06.2020 | LV | 03.06.2020 | MC | 03.06.2020 | MK | 03.06.2020 | MT | 03.06.2020 | NL | 03.06.2020 | RS | 03.06.2020 | SI | 03.06.2020 | SK | 03.06.2020 | SM | 03.06.2020 | BG | 03.09.2020 | GR | 04.09.2020 | IS | 03.10.2020 | PT | 06.10.2020 | IE | 16.12.2020 | LU | 16.12.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MT | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 03.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8030236 (KLISCHAT HANS-JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-8* columns 7-8 * |