EP3396030 - SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE, AND EPITAXIAL WAFER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tamura Corporation 1-19-43 Higashi-Oizumi Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-8511 / JP | For all designated states National University Corporation Tokyo University Of Agriculture and Technology 3-8-1, Harumi-cho Fuchu-shi Tokyo 183-8538 / JP | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTO, Ken c/o Tamura Corporation 1-19-43 Higashi-Oizumi Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-8511 / JP | 02 /
KUMAGAI, Yoshinao c/o National University Corporation Tokyo University of Agriculture and Technology 3-8-1 Harumi-cho Fuchu-shi Tokyo 183-8538 / JP | 03 /
MURAKAMI, Hisashi c/o National University Corporation Tokyo University of Agriculture and Technology 3-8-1 Harumi-cho Fuchu-shi Tokyo 183-8538 / JP | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 16875325.9 | 16.11.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016JP83986 | Priority number, date | JP20150245570 | 16.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015245570 | [2018/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017104341 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3396030 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/16, C30B25/20 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
C30B29/16 (EP,US);
H01L21/02293 (US);
C30B25/16 (US);
C30B25/20 (US);
C30B25/205 (EP);
H01L21/02609 (US);
H01L21/02631 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/44] | C30B29/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERSUBSTRAT UND EPITAKTISCHER WAFER SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2018/44] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE, AND EPITAXIAL WAFER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2018/44] | French: | SUBSTRAT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, ET PLAQUETTE ÉPITAXIALE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2018 | Translation filed | 16.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 20.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP2754736 (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [XD] 1,2,5,6,8 * claims 1, 2, 4, 5 *; | [XAI]WO2015046006 (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8-10,13-15 * claims 1, 7 * [A] 11,12 [I] 3,4,16; | [X]EP2924150 (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * claims 1-3, 7 * * paragraph [0034] *; | [A]WO2015170774 (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document * | International search | [XA]JP2015091740 (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK, et al) [X] 1, 2, 5, 6, 8-10, 13-15 * , claims 1 to 12; paragraphs [0001] to [0101]; fig. 1, 2 & US 2016/0265137 A1 claims 1 to 18; paragraphs [0001] to [0119] & WO 2015/046006 A1 & EP 3054037 A1 * [A] 3, 4, 7, 11, 12, 16; | [A]JP2015214448 (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK, et al) [A] 1-16 * , full specification & WO 2015/170774 A1 * | by applicant | WO2013035464 |