EP3391771 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, PRINTING SYSTEM, AND PRINTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2018/43] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKASAWA, Soichi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
SHIGA, Fumiko c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
ISHIDUKA, Naoko c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
OUYANG, Yue c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 05 /
TAKAHASHI, Sachiko c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 06 /
TANGE, Akira c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 07 /
KAWATA, Shogo c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 08 /
UCHIYAMA, Nobuyuki c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 09 /
WATANABE, Tomomasa c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/43] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 16875525.4 | 08.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016JP86616 | Priority number, date | JP20150247268 | 18.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015247268 | [2018/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017104545 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3391771 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50, A45D29/00, B41J21/00, // A45D29/22 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
A45D29/00 (EP);
B41J29/393 (US);
A45D29/22 (EP,US);
B41J21/00 (EP);
G06F30/00 (EP);
A45D2029/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | A45D29/00, B41J21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DRUCKSYSTEM UND DRUCKVERFAHREN | [2018/43] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, PRINTING SYSTEM, AND PRINTING METHOD | [2018/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, SYSTÈME D'IMPRESSION, ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2018 | Translation filed | 11.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 19.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2013220146 (PANASONIC CORP) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0093] * * figures 1,2,8,10-12 *; | [I]US2012113171 (MURATA YOSHIYUKI [JP]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0152] - paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0187] - paragraph [0188] * * paragraph [0193] - paragraph [0198] * * paragraph [0247] - paragraph [0248] * * paragraph [0345] * * paragraph [0353] * * figures 30,52-53 *; | [A]JP2004188714 (CANON KK) [A] 5 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2009266193 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 7 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0044] * | International search | [XA]JP2004188714 (CANON KK) [X] 1-2, 5, 8-10, 13-14 * , paragraphs [0008] to [0047]; fig. 1 to 8 (Family: none) * [A] 3-4, 6-7, 11-12; | [XA]JP2009266193 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1, 7-9, 14 * , paragraphs [0058] to [0079]; fig. 1 to 23 (Family: none) * [A] 2-6, 10-13; | [A]JP2013192594 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0044] to [0083]; fig. 1 to 23 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012010848 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0033] to [0037]; fig. 1 to 15 (Family: none) * |