Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3391888 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2016374416 CA3008607 CN201680081836 EP16875668 IL26002518 JP2016087170W JP2017556086 KR20187016821 US201616061495



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11040048Global Dossier 22.06.2021B2
US2020261481 20.08.2020A1
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102084109BGlobal Dossier 03.03.2020B1
KR20180080320 11.07.2018A
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6323860BGlobal Dossier 16.05.2018B2
JPWO2017104691 05.04.2018A1
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL260025Global Dossier 31.07.2018A
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108697715Global Dossier 23.10.2018A
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3008607Global Dossier 22.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2016374416Global Dossier 14.06.2018A1
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3391888Global Dossier 27.09.2023C0
EP3391888Global Dossier 27.09.2023B1
EP3391888 03.07.2019A4
EP3391888 24.10.2018A1
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112018011103 21.11.2018A2
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CR20180356 22.08.2018A
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1254961 02.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2018006966 21.09.2018A
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2745071 18.03.2021C2
RU2018121145 06.03.2020A3
RU2018121145 17.01.2020A
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG11201804348S 28.06.2018A
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA201803246 31.07.2019B
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
WO2016JP87170 14.12.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017104691Global Dossier 22.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CL2018001618 21.12.2018A1
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MA44080 24.10.2018A
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PE20181516 21.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG10201911957Q 27.02.2020A
Priority number Date
JP2015244492 15.12.2015