13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
03.06.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
25.06.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
22.06.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
18.06.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.06.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.02.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.01.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
29.01.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
29.01.2021 |
Change - German title |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
29.01.2021 |
Change - English title |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
29.01.2021 |
Change - French title |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
15.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.05.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.10.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
18.10.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
18.10.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
25.06.2019 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
11.03.2019 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.02.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
22.02.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.12.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
21.09.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
21.09.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
27.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
16.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|