Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10518747 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2019 | B2 | US2018354459 | 13.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150180973 | 17.12.2015 | WO2016KR14896 | 19.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102653954B | Global Dossier | 03.04.2024 | B1 | KR20230084432 | 13.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150180973 | 17.12.2015 | KR20230069377 | 30.05.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108367690B | Global Dossier | 07.05.2021 | B | CN108367690 | 03.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150180973 | 17.12.2015 | WO2016KR14896 | 19.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3392075 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2021 | B1 | EP3392075 | 20.11.2019 | A4 | EP3392075 | 24.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150180973 | 17.12.2015 | WO2016KR14896 | 19.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017105159 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150180973 | 17.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102544115B | Global Dossier | 19.06.2023 | B1 | KR20170072993 | 28.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150180973 | 17.12.2015 |