EP3389403 - STEVIOL GLYCOSIDE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PureCircle USA Inc. 915 Harger Road, Suite 250 Oak Brook, IL 60523-1492 / US | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PURKAYASTHA, Siddhartha 1250 South Indiana Avenue Apt. 1003 Chicago, IL 60605 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, John 507 North Ada Street Chicago, IL 60642 / US | 03 /
PETIT, Marcia 9264 S. Burnside Avenue Chicago, IL 60619 / US | 04 /
MARKOSYAN, Avetik 8-27 Paruyr Sevak Street Kanaker Zeytun Yerevan 0014 / AM | 05 /
CHKHAN, Kristina 4B-6-5 Tivolli Villa Jalan Medan Tanduk Bukit Banadaraya Bangsar Kuala Lumpur 59100 / MY | 06 /
ADAMYAN, Mariam 5/D Persada Aman Alam Milenia Bandar Enstek Negeri Sembilan 71760 / MY | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 16876732.5 | 15.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016US67053 | Priority number, date | US201562267521P | 15.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562267521 P | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017106577 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3389403 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A23L27/30, A23L2/60, C07H15/24, C13K13/00, A23L2/54, A23L2/68 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
A23L27/36 (EP,US);
A23L2/54 (EP,US);
A23L2/60 (EP,US);
A23L2/68 (EP,US);
A23L27/30 (RU);
C07H15/24 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | A23L27/30, A23L2/60, C07H15/24, C13K13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | STEVIOLGLYCOSIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2018/43] | English: | STEVIOL GLYCOSIDE COMPOSITIONS | [2018/43] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE GLYCOSIDE DE STÉVIOL | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 16.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.03.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2014197898 (PURECIRCLE USA INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020]; examples 2,3; claims 1-13; table 3 *; | [XP]WO2016143361 (MORITA KAGAKU KOGYO [JP]) [XP] 1-8 * examples 1-28 *; | [E]WO2017059414 (COCA COLA CO [US], et al) [E] 1-8* examples 1-8 *; | EP3269257 [ ] (MORITA KAGAKU KOGYO [JP]); | [XI] - ESPINOZA MARIA INES ET AL, "Identification, Quantification, and Sensory Characterization of Steviol Glycosides from Differently Processed Stevia rebaudiana Commercial Extracts", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, BOOKS AND JOURNALS DIVISION, US, vol. 62, no. 49, doi:10.1021/JF502878K, ISSN 0021-8561, (20141012), pages 11797 - 11804, (20141113), XP009505285 [X] 1-3,7,8 * page 11803, column left, line 31 - line 45; tables 2,3 * [I] 4-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf502878k | International search | [X]WO2015023928 (CARGILL INC [US]) [X] 1-6, 6b, 7 * entire document *; | [A]US2015141632 (MARKOSYAN AVETIK [AM]) [A] 1-6, 6b, 7* entire document * |