EP3394969 - DIGITALLY CONTROLLED ZERO VOLTAGE SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAIDYA, Vaibhav 735 SW Saint Clair Avenue Apt. 2109 Portland Oregon 97205 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Pavan 14846 NW Wendy Lane Portland Oregon 97229 / US | 03 /
RAVICHANDRAN, Krishnan 20323 Glen Brae Dr. Saratoga California 95070 / US | 04 /
DE, Vivek K. 9785 SW 151st Avenue Beaverton Oregon 97007 / US | [2019/04] |
Former [2018/47] | 01 /
VAIDYA, Vaibhav 735 SW Saint Clair Avenue Apt. 1608 Portland Oregon 97205 / US | ||
02 /
KUMAR, Pavan 14846 NW Wendy Lane Portland Oregon 97229 / US | |||
03 /
RAVICHANDRAN, Krishnan 20323 Glen Brae Dr. Saratoga California 95070 / US | |||
04 /
DE, Vivek K. 9785 SW 151st Avenue Beaverton Oregon 97007 / US | |||
Former [2018/44] | 01 /
VAIDYA, Vaibhav 735 SW Saint Clair Avenue Apt. 1608 Portland Oregon 97205 / US | ||
02 /
KUMAR, Pavan 5283 NW Crady Lane Portland Oregon 97229 / US | |||
03 /
RAVICHANDRAN, Krishnan 20323 Glen Brae Dr. Saratoga California 95070 / US | |||
04 /
DE, Vivek K. 9785 SW 151st Avenue Beaverton Oregon 97007 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/44] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16879806.4 | 23.11.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016US63689 | Priority number, date | US201514757802 | 23.12.2015 Original published format: US201514757802 | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017112322 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3394969 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/08, H02M1/38, H02M3/155, H02M3/158, H03K17/13, // H02M1/00 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
H02M1/083 (EP,KR,US);
H02M1/38 (EP,US);
H02M3/155 (KR);
H02M3/1588 (EP,US);
H03K17/133 (KR);
H02M1/0012 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/44] | H02M1/08, H03K17/13, H02M3/155 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Title | German: | DIGITAL GESTEUERTE NULLSPANNUNGSUMSCHALTUNG | [2018/44] | English: | DIGITALLY CONTROLLED ZERO VOLTAGE SWITCHING | [2018/44] | French: | COMMUTATION À TENSION NULLE À COMMANDE NUMÉRIQUE | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 23.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010020569 (MELANSON JOHN L [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] - [0 25]; figure 1 * [I] 2-5,7-15; | [A]US2012133540 (CHOI SEONG HOON [KR], et al) [A] 2,3,7,8,12,13 * paragraphs [0036] - [0045]; figure 2 *; | [A] - PAPASTERGIOU K D ET AL, "An Airborne Radar Power Supply With Contactless Transfer of Energy Part II: Converter Design", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20071001), vol. 54, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TIE.2007.901370, ISSN 0278-0046, pages 2885 - 2893, XP011467616 [A] 4,9,14 * equation 4; page 2887 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIE.2007.901370 | [A] - M Hallworth ET AL, "Analytical calculation of resonant inductance for zero voltage switching in phase shifted full bridge converters", (20131231), URL: http://centaur.reading.ac.uk/31750/1/Analytical%20Calculation%20of%20Resonant%20Inductance%20for%20Zero%20Voltage%20Switching%20in%20Phase-Shifted%20Full-Bridge%20Converters%20-%20Hallworth%202012.pdf, (20190704), XP055602656 [A] 4,9,14 * equation 11; page 8 * | [A] - MACELLARI MICHELE ET AL, "Dead time generator for synchronous boost converters with GaN transistors", 2014 IEEE INTERNATIONAL ELECTRIC VEHICLE CONFERENCE (IEVC), IEEE, (20141217), doi:10.1109/IEVC.2014.7056113, pages 1 - 6, XP032744179 [A] 1-15 * Section II: The proposed dead time controller; pages 530, 531; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEVC.2014.7056113 | International search | [A]US2006152204 (MAKSIMOVIC DRAGAN [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0063] and figure 3. *; | [A]US2006164867 (DIKKEN JAN [NL], et al) [A] 1-25* See paragraphs [0043]-[0046] and figures 2-3. *; | [A]US2008224677 (KIM KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0016] and figure 3. *; | [A]US2012105034 (BROWN JAMES E C [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraph [0040] and figure 16. *; | [A]US2013063984 (SANDNER CHRISTOPH [AT], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0031] and figures 1-5. * |