EP3394718 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REGISTERING FOR CARD AUTHENTICATION READS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trusona, Inc. 8776 East Shea Boulevard Suite 106 Nr 603 Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US | [2020/42] |
Former [2018/44] | For all designated states Trusona, Inc. 8767 E. Via de Ventura Suite 275 Scottsdale, AZ 85258-3383 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EISEN, Ori 7501 North Via De La Escuela Scottsdale, AZ 85258 / US | 02 /
MANGU-THITU, Nikolas 2156 Call Drive Lexington, Kentucky 40505 / US | [2019/18] |
Former [2018/44] | 01 /
EISEN, Ori 7501 North Via De La Escuela Scottsdale AZ 85258 / US | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/44] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16880053.0 | 21.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016US68122 | Priority number, date | US201562387462P | 23.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562387462 P | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017112812 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3394718 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/04, G06F21/34, G06F21/44, G06Q20/34, G06Q20/40, H04L29/06 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4016 (US);
G06F21/44 (EP,US);
G06Q20/34 (US);
H04L63/00 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2117 (EP,US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/44] | G06F7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGISTRIERUNG VON KARTENAUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSABLESUNGEN | [2018/44] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REGISTERING FOR CARD AUTHENTICATION READS | [2018/44] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ENREGISTREMENT DE LECTURES D'AUTHENTIFICATION DE CARTE | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 05.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0074007 (UTM SYSTEMS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 9 - line 13; figures 1-7 * * page 7, line 10 - line 12 * * page 8, line 15 - line 16 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US2002153416 (KROLL MARK W [US]) [A] 2,4,13 * figure 8 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * claims 10-15 *; | [A]US2008179401 (HART ANNMARIE D [US], et al) [A] 2,3,13 * figures 4,12,13 ** paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] *; | [IP]WO2016141356 (TRUSONA INC [US]) [IP] 1-15 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0137] * * claims 16,18 * | International search | [Y]US2012066740 (DOUGHTY RALPH O [US], et al) [Y] 4 * , entire document, especially abstract and para [0053]. *; | [A]US2014363057 (ECKEL ROBERT ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-15* , entire document. *; | [XY]US2015317624 (SAUNDERS PETER D [US]) [X] 1-3, 5-15 * , entire document, especially abstract and para [0039], [0043]-[0047], [0068]-[0069], [0071]-[0075], [0087]-[0093], [0105], [0159], [0163]-[0164], [0184], [0192], Fig. 1A, Fig. 2, Fig. 21. * [Y] 4 | by applicant | WO0074007 |