EP3428215 - THERMOSETTING RESIN COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, PREPREG, LAMINATE, AND PRINTED WIRING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 9-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUSHIDA, Keisuke c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 9-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | 02 /
SHIMIZU, Hiroshi c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 9-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | 03 /
KAKITANI, Minoru c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 9-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | 04 /
SHIRAOKAWA, Yoshikatsu c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 9-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | 05 /
KANEKO, Tatsunori c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 9-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 16880182.7 | 07.12.2016 | [2019/03] | WO2016JP86457 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018105071 | Date: | 14.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3428215 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3428215 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K9/06, C08K5/3415, C08K3/36, C08L63/00, C08L35/06 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
C08L63/00 (EP,KR);
C08L79/08 (CN);
C08L33/24 (US);
B32B15/08 (EP,CN,KR);
B32B15/092 (CN);
B32B27/20 (CN);
B32B33/00 (CN);
C08F2/44 (EP,KR,US);
C08F212/08 (US);
C08F222/06 (US);
C08F299/02 (EP,KR);
C08G59/42 (EP,US);
C08J5/244 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08J5/249 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08K3/06 (KR);
C08K3/36 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/0066 (US);
C08K5/3415 (US);
C08K5/521 (KR,US);
C08K5/5333 (US);
C08K9/06 (US);
C08L35/06 (EP,KR);
C08L63/04 (US);
H05K1/0353 (CN);
H05K1/0366 (EP,KR);
H05K1/0373 (EP,KR);
B32B2270/00 (CN);
B32B2307/204 (CN);
B32B2307/306 (CN);
B32B2457/08 (CN);
C08K5/5313 (EP);
C08L2201/02 (US);
C08L2201/08 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08K5/0066, C08K5/3415, C08K9/06, C08L35/06 (EP);
C08L63/00, C08L35/06, C08K5/3415, C08K9/06, C08K5/0066 (EP);
C08L79/08, C08L63/04, C08L35/06, C08K9/06, C08K3/36, C08K5/5313 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2019/03] | C08G59/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEHÄRTENDE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DEREN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, PREPREG, LAMINAT UND GEDRUCKTE PLATINE | [2019/03] | English: | THERMOSETTING RESIN COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, PREPREG, LAMINATE, AND PRINTED WIRING BOARD | [2019/03] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE THERMODURCISSABLE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, PRÉIMPRÉGNÉ, STRATIFIÉ ET CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2017 | Translation filed | 05.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2017 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 14.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2016 | AL | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | IT | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | TR | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | GB | 07.12.2020 | IE | 07.12.2020 | LU | 07.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | FR | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 07.12.2016 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
GB | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
GB | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
GB | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
GB | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | JP2010053334 [ ]; | [A]JP2010053334 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [I]WO2016175326 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0074] * * example - * * claim - *; | [E]WO2016194927 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-15 * example - ** claim - *; | [E]EP3290480 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-15 | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 20, Database accession no. 2010-C56324, & JP2010053334 A 20100311 (SEKISUI CHEM IND CO LTD) [ ] * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS50153098 (Sumitomo Bakelite Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-15 * , claim 1; example 2 & US 3985928 A claim 1 *; | [A]WO2009081601 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , claims 1 to 5; paragraphs [0038], [0064] & US 2010/0279129 A1 claim 1 *; | [A]JP2011006683 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , claims 1 to 10; paragraphs [0079], [0083] to [0084], [0097] to [0099]; paragraph [0114], example 12 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012229363 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-15* , claims 1 to 7; paragraphs [0041], [0055] to [0058] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPS56133355 | JPS5869046 | JPS58164638 | JPS6118937B | JPS61286130 | JPS62148512 | JPH02208355 | JPH06179734 |