EP3397823 - STRUCTURE-LINING APPARATUS WITH ADJUSTABLE WIDTH AND TOOL FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CFS Concrete Forming Systems Inc. 520 - 885 Dunsmuir Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6C 1N5 / CA | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHARDSON, George David 520 - 885 Dunsmuir Street Vancouver British Columbia V6C 1N5 / CA | 02 /
KRIVULIN, Semion 1503-6333 Katsura Street Richmond British Columbia V6Y 4L9 / CA | 03 /
FANG, Zi Li 7-365 Ginger Drive New Westminster British Columbia V3L 5L5 / CA | 04 /
LEUNG, Yue Heng 2911 East 54th Avenue Vancouver British Columbia V5S 1Y6 / CA | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/45] | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16880224.7 | 29.12.2016 | [2018/45] | WO2016CA51548 | Priority number, date | US201562273694P | 31.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562273694 P | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017113016 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3397823 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3397823 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 06.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/84, E04G11/06, E04G11/32, E04G21/14, E04B2/86 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
E04B1/6815 (EP,US);
B26B29/06 (EP,US);
B29C70/68 (EP,US);
E04B2/86 (US);
E04B2/8635 (EP,US);
E04C1/40 (US);
B28B23/005 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/45] | E04B2/84, E04G11/06, E04G11/32, E04G21/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRUKTURAUSKLEIDUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINSTELLBARER BREITE UND WERKZEUG HIERFÜR | [2018/45] | English: | STRUCTURE-LINING APPARATUS WITH ADJUSTABLE WIDTH AND TOOL FOR SAME | [2018/45] | French: | APPAREIL DE REVÊTEMENT DE STRUCTURE À LARGEUR AJUSTABLE ET OUTIL POUR CELUI-CI | [2018/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 30.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 04.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2016 | AL | 09.03.2022 | AT | 09.03.2022 | CY | 09.03.2022 | CZ | 09.03.2022 | DK | 09.03.2022 | EE | 09.03.2022 | ES | 09.03.2022 | FI | 09.03.2022 | HR | 09.03.2022 | IT | 09.03.2022 | LT | 09.03.2022 | LV | 09.03.2022 | MC | 09.03.2022 | MK | 09.03.2022 | MT | 09.03.2022 | NL | 09.03.2022 | PL | 09.03.2022 | RO | 09.03.2022 | RS | 09.03.2022 | SE | 09.03.2022 | SI | 09.03.2022 | SK | 09.03.2022 | SM | 09.03.2022 | BG | 09.06.2022 | NO | 09.06.2022 | GR | 10.06.2022 | IS | 09.07.2022 | PT | 11.07.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 29.12.2016 | |
AL | 09.03.2022 | ||
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
MK | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 29.12.2016 | |
AL | 09.03.2022 | ||
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MK | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 29.12.2016 | |
AL | 09.03.2022 | ||
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.12.2016 | |
AL | 09.03.2022 | ||
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 09.03.2022 | |
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 09.03.2022 | |
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.03.2022 | |
NO | 09.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014121337 (PERMAFORM AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-8,10-13,15 * page 5, line 11 - page 12, line 23; figures 1,3 *[I] 9,14 | International search | [Y]US5491947 (KIM SUN Y [US]) [Y] 10-12, 36, 37, 46-48 * Figure 3D *; | [A]US6247280 (GRINSHPUN VYACHESLAV S [US], et al) [A] 1, 38* Figure 5 *; | [A]US2010275547 (KAMATA YOSHIO [JP]) [A] 1, 38 * Par. 0043 *; | [XY]WO2014121337 (PERMAFORM AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-9, 13-35, 38-45, 49-70 * The Whole Document * [Y] 10-12, 36, 37, 46-48; | [A]US8992131 (CASTONGUAY BERTIN [CA], et al) [A] 1, 38 * Col. 10, lines 18-28 * |