EP3398949 - USES OF COMPOUND IN PREPARATION OF DRUGS FOR TREATING BRAIN GLIOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Pearl Biotechnology Limited Liability Company Room 402, 4F, Building 103 Lize Zhongyuan Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | For all designated states Beijing Neurosurgical Institute No.6 Tiantan Xili Dongcheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | [2021/01] |
Former [2018/45] | For all designated states Beijing Pearl Biotechnology Limited Liability Company Room 1305 of Reward Building A No.203 Section 2 Lize Zhongyuan Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | ||
For all designated states Beijing Neurosurgical Institute No.6 Tiantan Xili Dongcheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Tao No.6 Tiantan Xili Dongcheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Yanwei No.6 Tiantan Xili Dongcheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | 03 /
HU, Huimin No.6 Tiantan Xili Dongcheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | 04 /
SHI, Hepeng c/o Beijing Pearl Biotechnology Limited Liability Company Room 402, 4F, Building 103 Lize Zhongyuan, Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 05 /
XUE, Weizhe c/o Beijing Pearl Biotechnology Limited Liability Company Room 402, 4F, Building 103 Lize Zhongyuan, Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/45] | 01 /
JIANG, Tao No.6 Tiantan Xili Dongcheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | ||
02 /
LIU, Yanwei No.6 Tiantan Xili Dongcheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | |||
03 /
HU, Huimin No.6 Tiantan Xili Dongcheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | |||
04 /
SHI, Hepeng Room 1305 of Reward Building A No.203 Section 2 Lize Zhongyuan Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | |||
05 /
XUE, Weizhe Room 1305 of Reward Building A No.203 Section 2 Lize Zhongyuan Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [2018/45] | Application number, filing date | 16881038.0 | 21.12.2016 | [2018/45] | WO2016CN111227 | Priority number, date | CN20151122391 | 31.12.2015 Original published format: CN201511022391 | [2018/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017114249 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3398949 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3398949 | Date: | 03.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D471/04, C07D513/04, A61K31/5025, A61K31/5377, A61K31/437, A61K31/519, A61K31/433, A61P35/00 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
A61K31/433 (EP);
A61K31/5025 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/437 (EP);
A61K31/519 (EP);
A61K31/5377 (EP);
A61P35/00 (KR,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,KR);
C07D487/04 (EP,KR);
C07D513/04 (EP,KR);
C07K14/71 (KR);
C12N5/0693 (KR);
C12N9/16 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2018/45] | C07D487/04, C07D471/04, C07D513/04, A61K31/5025, A61K31/5377, A61K31/437, A61K31/519, A61K31/433 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER VERBINDUNG IN DER HERSTELLUNG VON ARZNEIMITTELN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HIRNGLIOMEN | [2018/45] | English: | USES OF COMPOUND IN PREPARATION OF DRUGS FOR TREATING BRAIN GLIOMA | [2018/45] | French: | UTILISATIONS DE COMPOSÉ DANS LA PRÉPARATION DE MÉDICAMENTS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU GLIOME CÉRÉBRAL | [2018/45] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2018 | Translation filed | 24.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 09.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2016 | AL | 03.02.2021 | AT | 03.02.2021 | CY | 03.02.2021 | CZ | 03.02.2021 | DK | 03.02.2021 | EE | 03.02.2021 | FI | 03.02.2021 | HR | 03.02.2021 | LT | 03.02.2021 | LV | 03.02.2021 | MC | 03.02.2021 | MK | 03.02.2021 | MT | 03.02.2021 | NL | 03.02.2021 | PL | 03.02.2021 | RO | 03.02.2021 | RS | 03.02.2021 | SE | 03.02.2021 | SI | 03.02.2021 | SK | 03.02.2021 | SM | 03.02.2021 | BG | 03.05.2021 | NO | 03.05.2021 | GR | 04.05.2021 | IS | 03.06.2021 | PT | 04.06.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.12.2016 | |
AL | 03.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
MK | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 21.12.2016 | |
AL | 03.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012028984 (WU ZHIPEI [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0054] - [0059] - [0079] * * claim - *; | [A]WO2014000713 (ZHEJIANG BETA PHARMA INC [CN], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 57, lines 2-4 * * pages 58-59 * * claim - *; | [A]WO2014032498 (CROWN BIOSCIENCE INC TAICANG [CN]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 30; compound 44 * * page 33; table 3; compound 44 * * claim - *; | [A]US2015037280 (XI NING [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0041] , [0530] - [0533] - [0536] - [0537] * * claim - *; | [A] - HUI-MIN CHEN ET AL, "Enhanced expression and phosphorylation of the MET oncoprotein by glioma-specific PTPRZ1-MET fusions", FEBS LETTERS., NL, (20150429), vol. 589, no. 13, doi:10.1016/j.febslet.2015.04.032, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 1437 - 1443, XP055507079 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2015.04.032 | [A] - ZHAO-SHI BAO ET AL, "RNA-seq of 272 gliomas revealed a novel, recurrent PTPRZ1-MET fusion transcript in secondary glioblastomas", GENOME RESEARCH, (20140818), vol. 24, no. 11, doi:10.1101/gr.165126.113, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 1765 - 1773, XP055202258 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.165126.113 | [T] - HU HUIMIN ET AL, "Mutational Landscape of Secondary Glioblastoma Guides MET-Targeted Trial in Brain Tumor", CELL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20181018), vol. 175, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2018.09.038, ISSN 0092-8674, page 1665, XP085544086 [T] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2018.09.038 |