EP3398088 - DARK WEB MONITORING, ANALYSIS AND ALERT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sixgill Ltd. 4 Hamada St. 2066718 Yokneam Illit / IL | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAVI, Elad P.O.B 81 4493000 Ramat Hakovesh / IL | 02 /
KASZTAN, Avi 10/14 Mordeachai Ben Dror St. 4922082 Petach Tiqwa / IL | [2019/10] |
Former [2018/45] | 01 /
LAVI, Elad P.O.B 81 4493000 Ramat Hakovesh / IL | ||
02 /
KASZTAN, Avi 15 Imber St. 4445115 Kfar Saba / IL | Representative(s) | Sonnenberg Harrison Partnerschaft mbB Herzogspitalstraße 10a 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/45] | Harrison, Robert John 24IP Law Group Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16881370.7 | 27.12.2016 | [2018/45] | WO2016IB58016 | Priority number, date | US201562271344P | 28.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562271344 P | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017115272 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3398088 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 06.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04W4/21 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
H04L63/1425 (EP,US);
G06F16/24578 (US);
G06F16/285 (US);
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
G06F21/00 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063 (EP,US);
G06Q50/26 (EP,US);
H04L63/0227 (EP,US);
H04L63/1408 (EP,US);
H04W4/21 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/45] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG, ANALYSE UND ALARMIERUNG DES DUNKLEN WEBS | [2018/45] | English: | DARK WEB MONITORING, ANALYSIS AND ALERT SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2018/45] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE, D'ANALYSE ET DE SURVEILLANCE DU DARK WEB | [2018/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 21.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013238600 (KINDLER NOAH [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0057] - [0083]; figures 9,10,16 *; | [X]US2015264078 (BEAUCHESNE NICOLAS [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0043]; figure 2 *; | [A] - DANG YAN ET AL, "An integrated framework for analyzing multilingual content in Web 2.0 social media", DECISION SUPPORT SYSTEMS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140226), vol. 61, doi:10.1016/J.DSS.2014.02.004, ISSN 0167-9236, pages 126 - 135, XP028604740 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [02.2] - [2.2.2.4] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.dss.2014.02.004 | International search | [X]US2009204610 (HELLSTROM BENJAMIN J [US], et al) [X] 1-82 * par. 0059, 0062, 0080, 0117, 0014, 0138, 0109, 0152, 0151, 0052-0053, 0100 *; | [X]US2013151616 (AMSTERDAMSKI LIOR [IL]) [X] 1-82 * par. 0033-0036, 0027, 0062-0063, 0052 *; | [X] - CHEN, HSINCHUN et al., "Uncovering the dark Web: A case study of Jihad on the Web.", Journal of the American Society for Information Science and Technology, (20080630), vol. 59, no. 8, pages 1347 - 1359, XP055396765 [X] 1-82 * abstract, sections 3-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/asi.20838 | [X] - FU, TIANJUN; et al., "A focused crawler for Dark Web forums.", Journal of the American Society for Information Science and Technology, (20100630), vol. 61, no. 6, pages 1213 - 1231, XP055396766 [X] 1-82 * abstract, fig. 1-3, p. 1220 "Identify appropriate proxies", p. 1224 "Spidering parameter experiment" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/asi.21323 | [A] - BIRYUKOV, ALEX; et al., "Trawling for tor hidden services: Detection, measurement, deanonymization.", Security and Privacy (SP), 2013 IEEE Symposium on., (20131231), pages 80 - 94, XP032431317 [A] 1-82 * abstract, the whole doc. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SP.2013.15 | by applicant | US2015264078 |