EP3397689 - BIOCOMPATIBLE AND CONDUCTIVE HYDROGELS WITH TUNABLE PHYSICAL AND ELECTRICAL PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northeastern University 360 Huntington Avenue Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANNABI, Nasim 1509 Veteran Ave. Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | 02 /
NOSHADI, Iman 179-1/2 Harvard Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | 01 /
ANNABI, Nasim 10 Rogers Street Apt. 411 Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | ||
02 /
NOSHADI, Iman 179-1/2 Harvard Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2018/45] | Application number, filing date | 16882710.3 | 29.12.2016 | [2018/45] | WO2016US69340 | Priority number, date | US201562272627P | 29.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562272627 P | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017117467 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3397689 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/04, C08L33/06, C08L33/08, C08L33/12, H01B1/06, H01B1/12, H01B1/20, C08H1/00 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
C08F265/06 (EP,US);
C08H1/00 (EP,US);
C08L5/04 (EP,US);
C08L5/08 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (US);
C08L89/00 (EP,US);
H01B1/12 (EP,US);
C08F220/36 (EP,US);
C08F251/00 (US);
C08F289/00 (US);
C08G2210/00 (US);
C08L51/02 (US);
C08L51/08 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/45] | C08L33/04, C08L33/06, C08L33/08, C08L33/12, H01B1/06, H01B1/12, H01B1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Title | German: | BIOKOMPATIBLE UND LEITFÄHIGE HYDROGELE MIT EINSTELLBAREN PHYSIKALISCHEN UND ELEKTRISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2018/45] | English: | BIOCOMPATIBLE AND CONDUCTIVE HYDROGELS WITH TUNABLE PHYSICAL AND ELECTRICAL PROPERTIES | [2018/45] | French: | HYDROGELS BIOCOMPATIBLES ET CONDUCTEURS PRÉSENTANT DES PROPRIÉTÉS PHYSIQUES ET ÉLECTRIQUES RÉGULABLES | [2018/45] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 18.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/35] | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - XIAOTENG JIA ET AL, "Biocompatible Ionic Liquid-Biopolymer Electrolyte-Enabled Thin and Compact Magnesium-Air Batteries", ACS APPLIED MATERIALS & INTERFACES, US, (20141210), vol. 6, no. 23, doi:10.1021/am505985z, ISSN 1944-8244, pages 21110 - 21117, XP055340148 [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [02.1] , [02.2] , [0003]; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/am505985z | [XA] - ORAWAN WINTHER-JENSEN ET AL, "Self polymerising ionic liquid gel", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (20090101), no. 21, doi:10.1039/b822905h, ISSN 1359-7345, page 3041, XP055604576 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * [A] 12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b822905h | [X] - KLINGSHIRN MARC A ET AL, "Gelation of Ionic Liquids Using a Cross-Linked Poly(Ethylene Glycol) Gel Matrix", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20040101), vol. 16, no. 16, doi:10.1021/CM0351792, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 3091 - 3097, XP002427746 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm0351792 | International search | [Y]WO2015001564 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL]) [Y] 3, 7, 8, 10, 12, 14, 15 * entire document *; | [XY] - SHARMA et al., "Preparation of tamarind gum based soft ion gels having thixotropic properties", Carbohydrate Polymers, (20131207), vol. 102, pages 467 - 471, XP028607332 [X] 1, 2, 6, 9, 11, 13 [Y] 3, 5, 7, 8, 10, 12, 14-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbpol.2013.11.063 | [Y] - WU et al., "Fabrication of conductive polyaniline hydrogel using porogen leaching and projection microstereolithography", Journal of Materials Chemistry B, (20150610), vol. 3, pages 5352 - 5360, XP055397975 [Y] 5, 16-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5TB00629E | [PX] - NOSHADI SR. et al., "465474 Novel Bio-Ionic Functionalized Cunductive Hydrogel for Cardiac Tissue Regeneration", 2016 AlChE Annual Meeting, (20161117), XP055397978 [PX] 1-20 * . entire document * |