EP3397337 - ELECTROPORATION DEVICE WITH DETACHABLE NEEDLE ARRAY WITH LOCK-OUT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inovio Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 660 W. Germantown Pike Suite 110 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMPILLO-AGUSTI, Alejandro c/o Inovio Pharmaceuticals Inc. 660 W. Germantown Pike Suite 110 Pylmouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | 02 /
HO, Eduardo E. c/o Inovio Pharmaceuticals Inc. 660 W. Germantown Pike Suite 110 Pylmouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | 03 /
LOVELL, Nathan c/o Inovio Pharmaceuticals Inc. 660 W. Germantown Pike Suite 110 Pylmouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | 04 /
MASTERSON, Steven c/o Inovio Pharmaceuticals Inc. 660 W. Germantown Pike Suite 110 Pylmouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | 05 /
STADELMANN, Beat c/o Inovio Pharmaceuticals Inc. 660 W. Germantown Pike Suite 110 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | 06 /
KEMMERRER, Stephen c/o Inovio Pharmaceuticals Inc. 660 W. Germantown Puke Suite 110 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | Leonard, Thomas Charles Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2018/45] | Application number, filing date | 16882739.2 | 30.12.2016 | [2018/45] | WO2016US69438 | Priority number, date | US201562272758P | 30.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562272758 P | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017117508 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3397337 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3397337 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/18, A61N1/32, A61F7/00, A61B17/34, A61N1/04, A61N1/00, A61B18/14, A61M37/00 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
A61N1/327 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61N1/18 (CN,RU);
A61B18/00 (CN);
A61B17/205 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61B17/34 (EP,IL,US);
A61B18/1477 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M37/00 (CN,IL,KR,US);
A61M5/20 (CN);
A61M5/326 (CN,IL,US);
A61N1/0424 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61B2018/00178 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61B2018/00196 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61B2018/00613 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61B2018/143 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61B2018/1475 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M2037/0007 (CN,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROPORATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT ABNEHMBARER NADELANORDNUNG MIT AUSSPERRSYSTEM | [2018/45] | English: | ELECTROPORATION DEVICE WITH DETACHABLE NEEDLE ARRAY WITH LOCK-OUT SYSTEM | [2018/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉLECTROPORATION AVEC ENSEMBLE D'AIGUILLES DÉTACHABLES AVEC SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE | [2018/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 28.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20188200.8 / EP3799922 | EP23193329.2 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2016 | AL | 29.07.2020 | AT | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | DK | 29.07.2020 | HR | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | MK | 29.07.2020 | MT | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | RS | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SM | 29.07.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | LU | 30.12.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 30.12.2016 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
MT | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005215941 (BERNARD ROBERT M [US], et al); | [A]WO2008134545 (ECHO THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2010080974 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5702359 (HOFMANN GUNTER A [US], et al); | [A]US6055453 (HOFMANN GUNTER A [US], et al); | [X]US2005215941 (BERNARD ROBERT M [US], et al); | [A]US2009030364 (HARMON JOHN W [US], et al); | [A]US2010179530 (LONG GARY L [US], et al); | [A]US2012059255 (PAUL SAURAV [US], et al); | [A]US2013041310 (KEMMERRER STEPHEN V [US], et al); | [A]US2013066296 (BRODERICK KATE [US], et al); | [A]US2013102954 (CHOI JONG-SOO [KR]); | [A]US2014222105 (BRODERICK KATE [US], et al) |