EP3401254 - RECORDING MEDIUM CONVEYING DEVICE AND RECORDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2018/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBATA Yohei c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 16883693.0 | 14.11.2016 | [2018/46] | WO2016JP83691 | Priority number, date | JP20160002307 | 08.01.2016 Original published format: JP 2016002307 | [2018/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017119193 | Date: | 13.07.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3401254 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3401254 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/06, B41J13/02, B41J15/16, B65H19/10, B65H19/22, B65H20/02, B41J15/04, B65H23/038 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
B65H20/02 (EP,US);
B41J13/02 (US);
B41J15/16 (US);
B65H19/10 (US);
B65H19/22 (US);
B65H23/038 (EP,US);
B65H5/06 (US);
B65H2404/1321 (EP,US);
B65H2404/1424 (EP,US);
B65H2404/143 (EP,US);
B65H2404/1523 (EP,US);
B65H2515/84 (EP,US);
B65H2801/36 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/46] | B65H5/06, B41J13/02, B41J15/16, B65H19/10, B65H19/22, B65H20/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEITERLEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/46] | English: | RECORDING MEDIUM CONVEYING DEVICE AND RECORDING DEVICE | [2018/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT DE SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT ET DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2018/46] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2018 | Translation filed | 08.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 05.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2016 | AL | 05.10.2022 | AT | 05.10.2022 | BG | 05.10.2022 | CY | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | MK | 05.10.2022 | NL | 05.10.2022 | PL | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SE | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | TR | 05.10.2022 | IE | 14.11.2022 | LU | 14.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | FR | 05.12.2022 | GB | 05.01.2023 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 14.11.2016 | |
AL | 05.10.2022 | ||
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CY | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
MK | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
TR | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 05.12.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 14.11.2016 | |
AL | 05.10.2022 | ||
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CY | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
MK | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 05.12.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 14.11.2016 | |
AL | 05.10.2022 | ||
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CY | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 05.12.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 14.11.2016 | |
AL | 05.10.2022 | ||
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 05.12.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 05.12.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 05.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]JP2001341897 (NORITSU KOKI CO LTD) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0018] - [0025] * * figures 1, 3, 4a, 4b * * abstract * [A] 5 [Y] 3 [I] 4; | [A]US2009102117 (YU CHANG-LUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 21] - [0024] ** figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]JP2014172745 (RICOH CO LTD) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 28] - [0031] - [0 35] , [0 41] - [0046] * * figures 1, 3, 4, 11a-11c, 12 * * abstract * | International search | [XY]JP2001341897 (NORITSU KOKI CO LTD) [X] 1, 2 * , paragraphs [0016] to [0020], [0029], [0033]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) * [Y] 3-6; | [Y]JP2010168220 (SEIKO I INFOTECH INC) [Y] 4-6* , paragraphs [0031], [0066]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014172745 (RICOH CO LTD) [Y] 3-6 * , paragraphs [0022] to [0023], [0028] to [0030], [0041] to [0042]; fig. 1, 4 to 7, 9, 11 (Family: none) * |