EP3402221 - AUDIO PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2018/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGARIYACHI Tetsu c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
MITSUFUJI Yuhki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
MAENO Yu c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16883817.5 | 22.12.2016 | [2018/46] | WO2016JP88379 | Priority number, date | JP20160002167 | 08.01.2016 Original published format: JP 2016002167 | [2018/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017119318 | Date: | 13.07.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3402221 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3402221 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04S7/00, H04R5/033 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
H04S7/304 (EP,US);
H04S3/008 (US);
H04R5/033 (EP,US);
H04S2400/01 (US);
H04S2420/01 (EP,US);
H04S2420/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/46] | H04S1/00, H04R1/10, H04R3/00, H04R5/033, H04S7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUDIOVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, -VERFAHREN UND -PROGRAMM | [2018/46] | English: | AUDIO PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2018/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT AUDIO, ET PROGRAMME | [2018/46] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2018 | Translation filed | 08.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 04.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2016 | AL | 08.04.2020 | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | ES | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | IT | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | NL | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | TR | 08.04.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | IE | 22.12.2020 | LU | 22.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 22.12.2016 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MK | 08.04.2020 | ||
MT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.12.2016 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7231054 (JOT JEAN-MARC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * columns 5,6 * * column 9, line 16 - column 10, line 38; figures 4,7 *; | [A]WO2010020788 (QUEEN MARY & WESTFIELD COLLEGE [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 13 - page 17 *; | [A] - WELLER TOBIAS ET AL, "Frequency Dependent Regularization of a Mixed-Order Ambisonics Encoding System Using Psychoacoustically Motivated Metrics", CONFERENCE: 55TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE: SPATIAL AUDIO; AUGUST 2014, AES, 60 EAST 42ND STREET, ROOM 2520 NEW YORK 10165-2520, USA, (20140826), XP040638972 [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [02.1] , [ 3.3] * | [A] - JOT JEAN-MARC ET AL., "Binaural simulation of complex acoustic schenes for interactive audio", AES, 60 EAST 42ND STREET, ROOM 2520 NEW YORK 10165-2520, USA, (20061005), pages 1 - 20, XP040373279 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2006506918 (France Telecom S.A.) [A] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0017], [0034] to [0036], [0109] to [0136] & US 2006/0045275 A1 paragraphs [0029] to [0031], [0056] to [0069], [0175] to [0202] & WO 2004/049299 A1 & EP 1563485 A1 & FR 2847376 A & KR 10-2005-0083928 A & CN 1735922 A *; | [A]US2010329466 (BERGE SVEIN [NO]) [A] 1-12* , paragraphs [0033] to [0045] & EP 2268064 A1 & EP 2285139 A2 *; | [A]JP2015159598 (THOMSON LICENSING) [A] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0011] to [0017] & WO 2011/117399 A1 Background, Summary of the Invention & US 2015/0294672 A1 & EP 2553947 A1 & CN 102823277 A & KR 10-2013-0031823 A * |