EP3332896 - 3D PRINTING DEVICE, CONTROL METHOD FOR 3D PRINTING DEVICE, AND CONTROL PROGRAM FOR 3D PRINTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technology Research Association For Future Additiv 6F Nihonbashi First Bldg. 2-19 Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIMAKI Shimpei c/o TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION FOR FUTURE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING TRAFAM-TOSHIBA-MACHINE-NUMAZU SUBOFFICE 2068-3 Ooka Numazu-shi Shizuoka 410-8510 / JP | 02 /
FUNAKI Takahiro c/o TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION FOR FUTURE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING TRAFAM-TOSHIBA-MACHINE-NUMAZU SUBOFFICE 2068-3 Ooka Numazu-shi Shizuoka 410-8510 / JP | 03 /
SATO Shoichi c/o TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION FOR FUTURE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING TRAFAM-TOSHIBA-MACHINE-NUMAZU SUBOFFICE 2068-3 Ooka Numazu-shi Shizuoka 410-8510 / JP | [2018/49] |
Former [2018/25] | 01 /
FUJIMAKI Shimpei c/o TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION FOR FUTURE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING TRAFAM-TOSHIBA-MACHINE-NUMAZU SUBOFFICE 2068-3 Ooka Numazu-shi Shizuoka 410-8510 / JP | ||
02 /
FUNAKI Takahiro c/o TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION FOR FUTURE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING TRAFAM-TOSHIBA-MACHINE-NUMAZU SUBOFFICE 2068-3 Ooka Numazu-shi Shizuoka 410-8510 / JP | |||
03 /
SATO Shoichi c/o TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION FOR FUTURE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING TRAFAM-TOSHIBA-MACHINE-NUMAZU SUBOFFICE 2068-3 Ooka Numazu-shi Shizuoka 410-8510 / JP | |||
04 /
KATO, Takashi c/o Technology Research Association for future additive Manufacturing TRAFAM-TOSHIBA-MACHINE-NUMAZU Suboffice 2068-3, Ooka Numazu-shi, Shizuok a 4108510 / JP | |||
Former [2018/24] | 01 /
FUJIMAKI, Shimpei c/o Technology Research Association for future additive Manufacturing TRAFAM-TOSHIBA-MACHINE-NUMAZU Suboffice 2068-3, Ooka Numazu-shi, Shizuok a 4108510 / JP | ||
02 /
FUNAKI, Takahiro c/o Technology Research Association for future additive Manufacturing TRAFAM-TOSHIBA-MACHINE-NUMAZU Suboffice 2068-3, Ooka Numazu-shi, Shizuok a 4108510 / JP | |||
03 /
SATO, Shoichi c/o Technology Research Association for future additive Manufacturing TRAFAM-TOSHIBA-MACHINE-NUMAZU Suboffice 2068-3, Ooka Numazu-shi, Shizuok a 4108510 / JP | |||
04 /
KATO, Takashi c/o Technology Research Association for future additive Manufacturing TRAFAM-TOSHIBA-MACHINE-NUMAZU Suboffice 2068-3, Ooka Numazu-shi, Shizuok a 4108510 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/24] | Application number, filing date | 16885443.8 | 05.10.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016JP79693 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018066099 | Date: | 12.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3332896 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/16, B22F3/105, B33Y30/00, B33Y50/02 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B29C64/20 (US);
B22F10/25 (EP,US);
B29C64/386 (US);
B33Y50/02 (EP);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F10/36 (EP,US);
B22F10/366 (EP,US);
B22F12/53 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Title | German: | 3D-DRUCK-VORRICHTUNG, STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR 3D-DRUCK-VORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSPROGRAMM FÜR 3D-DRUCK-VORRICHTUNG | [2018/24] | English: | 3D PRINTING DEVICE, CONTROL METHOD FOR 3D PRINTING DEVICE, AND CONTROL PROGRAM FOR 3D PRINTING DEVICE | [2018/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION 3D, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE POUR DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION 3D ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE POUR DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION 3D | [2018/24] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2017 | Translation filed | 24.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2017 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 24.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 23.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3866179 (MCGEE JOHN K, et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XI]JPH02179373 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-12 * figures 2-6 * * paragraph [0001] * * claim 1 * [I] 4; | [A]JPH04237582 (YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORP) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [XI]US5453594 (KONECNY KARL F [US]) [X] 1,3-9,11,12 * figures 1-4 * * column 4, line 12 - column 10, line 65 * [I] 10; | [X]EP1369197 (YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0071] *; | [A]US2013087536 (SUZUKI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2015133138 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * , & KR 10-2016-0123386 A *; | [A]JP2015199197 (MATSURA KIKAI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-12 * , & US 2015/0283762 A1 & EP 2926981 A1 & CN 104972119 A & KR 10-2015-0115598 A & CA 2870943 A1 *; | [A]US2016236417 (ROTHENBERG BRADLEY A [US]) [A] 1-12* , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP5997850B (Technology Research Association for Future Additive Manufacturing) [A] 1-12 * , & WO 2016/151713 A1 & EP 3095592 A1 * | by applicant | JPH0230388 | JP3211902B | JP3825123B | JP5255137B |