EP3410144 - HIGH-PRECISION, REAL-TIME SATELLITE POSITIONING DEVICE AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BroadGNSS Technology Co., Ltd. 802B, Science and Research Building Tsinghua Information Port II, North District Nanshan High-tech Zone Shenzhen 518057 / CN | [2018/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN, Yan Suite 101, Block 40, Xinheli Meteorological Station Road Heping District Tianjin / CN | 02 /
LI, Yuanbo Suite A-703, Huanyuan Building, Xixiang Street Baoan District, Shenzhen City, Guangdong / CN | [2018/49] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [2023/23] |
Former [2018/49] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 16887742.1 | 09.12.2016 | [2018/49] | WO2016CN109101 | Priority number, date | CN20161064456 | 29.01.2016 Original published format: CN201610064456 | [2018/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017128871 | Date: | 03.08.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3410144 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3410144 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/36, G01S19/42 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G01S19/36 (EP,US);
G01S19/42 (CN);
G01S19/40 (US);
G01S19/41 (CN,US);
G01S19/426 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | G01S19/36, G01S19/41, G01S19/42 | ||
Former IPC [2018/49] | G01S5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHGENAUE, ECHTZEIT-SATELLITENPOSITIONIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/49] | English: | HIGH-PRECISION, REAL-TIME SATELLITE POSITIONING DEVICE AND METHOD THEREOF | [2018/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LOCALISATION PAR SATELLITE EN TEMPS RÉEL À HAUTE PRÉCISION, ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2018/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2018 | Translation filed | 29.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 10.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009195475 (ASHJAEE JAVAD [US], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document * |