EP3299071 - PROTECTIVE EQUIPMENT FOR TRANSMITTING A SCORE IN SPORTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Park Lee, Chuen Wook Balmes, 55 - Bajos 08007 Barcelona / ES | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P. Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [2018/13] | Application number, filing date | 16889177.8 | 05.02.2016 | [2018/13] | WO2016ES70069 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017134317 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | ES | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3299071 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 10.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A63B71/08, G01L5/00, A63B69/00, A63B71/06, A63B71/12 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
A63B71/0605 (EP,US);
A63B71/0669 (EP,KR,US);
A63B71/08 (EP,KR,US);
A63B69/02 (KR);
A63B71/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/065 (KR);
B32B27/30 (KR);
B32B5/18 (KR);
G01L5/00 (EP,US);
G01L5/0019 (US);
H10N30/302 (KR);
A63B2069/025 (KR);
A63B2071/1208 (US);
A63B2209/00 (KR);
A63B2220/17 (EP,US);
A63B2220/53 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/13] | A63B71/08, G01L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Title | German: | SCHUTZAUSRÜSTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON PUNKTEN IM SPORT | [2018/13] | English: | PROTECTIVE EQUIPMENT FOR TRANSMITTING A SCORE IN SPORTS | [2018/13] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT DE PROTECTION POUR LA TRANSMISSION D'UN SCORE SPORTIF | [2018/13] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2017 | Translation filed | 27.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 27.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/14] | 02.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0222640 (FRENCH BARRY J [US]); | [Y]FR2898717 (DESROSES MICHEL [FR], et al); | [Y]DE202010004520U (KOSLOWSKI HELMUT [DE]) | International search | [X]EP0222640 (FRENCH BARRY J [US]); | [A]WO2004004840 (LOVISON DOUGLAS [US]); | [X]KR101018038B (LEE BYUNG HO [KR]); | [A]US2011251802 (SONG JIN Y [US]); | KR20130067404 [ ] (ADVANCED MATERIALS & NANO TECHNOLOGY [KR]) |