EP3447137 - LIQUID ENZYME PREPARATION AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kinry Food Ingredients Co., Ltd. 4th Floor (West) Building A No.258 of Jiamei Road Jiading District Shanghai 201802 / CN | For all designated states Kinry Biotech (Jinan) Co., Ltd. Changan Industrial Park of Longsansi Town Shanhe County Jinan, Shandong 251606 / CN | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Fangming 4th Floor (West) Building A No.258 of Jiamei Road Jiading District Shanghai 201802 / CN | 02 /
XIE, Yongqiang 4th Floor (West) Building A No.258 of Jiamei Road Jiading District Shanghai 201802 / CN | 03 /
XU, Baodi 4th Floor (West) Building A No.258 of Jiamei Road Jiading District Shanghai 201802 / CN | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 16890284.9 | 16.05.2016 | [2018/52] | WO2016CN82178 | Priority number, date | CN20161086526 | 16.02.2016 Original published format: CN201610086526 | [2018/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017140051 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447137 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3447137 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/96, C12N9/10 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
C12N9/1044 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C12N9/96 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C12Y203/02013 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGE ENZYMZUBEREITUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/52] | English: | LIQUID ENZYME PREPARATION AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | [2018/52] | French: | PRÉPARATION D'ENZYME LIQUIDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2018 | Translation filed | 20.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 20.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.2021
28.05.2021
ADMISSIBLE International N&H Denmark ApS Parallelvej 16 2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [2024/23] |
Former [2021/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.2021
28.05.2021
ADMISSIBLE DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 1411 Copenhagen K / DK Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | 08.06.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.10.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.01.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.01.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 27.02.2024 | Appeal received No. T0324/24 | 27.02.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 22.04.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2016 | AL | 26.08.2020 | AT | 26.08.2020 | CY | 26.08.2020 | CZ | 26.08.2020 | EE | 26.08.2020 | HR | 26.08.2020 | LV | 26.08.2020 | MC | 26.08.2020 | MK | 26.08.2020 | RO | 26.08.2020 | RS | 26.08.2020 | SE | 26.08.2020 | SI | 26.08.2020 | SK | 26.08.2020 | SM | 26.08.2020 | BG | 26.11.2020 | NO | 26.11.2020 | GR | 27.11.2020 | IS | 26.12.2020 | PT | 28.12.2020 | IE | 16.05.2021 | LU | 16.05.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 16.05.2016 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.05.2021 | ||
LU | 16.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.05.2021 | ||
LU | 16.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.05.2021 | ||
LU | 16.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 26.08.2020 | |
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | HR | 26.08.2020 | |
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | SE | 26.08.2020 | |
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | NO | 26.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2251421 (AMANO ENZYME INC [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0020]; claim 10 *; | [A] - JEITNER T M ET AL, "Mechanism for the inhibition of transglutaminase 2 by cystamine", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, US, vol. 69, no. 6, ISSN 0006-2952, (20050315), pages 961 - 970, (20050315), XP027715596 [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - KIELISZEK MAREK ET AL, "Microbial transglutaminase and its application in the food industry. A review", FOLIA MICROBIOLOGICA, SPRINGER NETHERLANDS, NL, vol. 59, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S12223-013-0287-X, ISSN 0015-5632, (20131108), pages 241 - 250, (20131108), XP035323972 [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 242, column r * * page 245, column r, paragraph last - page 246, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12223-013-0287-x | International search | [XY]CN104024406 (VALIO LTD) [X] 1 * , see claims 1-16, and description, paragraphs 28, 31-32 and 98-103, see claims 1-16, and description, paragraphs 28, 31-32 and 98-103 * [Y] 2-10; | [PX]CN105462950 (SHANGHAI KINFI FOOD TECH CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-10 * , see claims 1-10 *; | [Y] - WANG, MEILING, "Microbial Trans-glutaminase and Its Application in Food Industry", SHANDONG FOOD FERMENT, (20150228), ISSN 1671-5799, pages 34 - 36, XP009512226 [Y] 2-10 * see page 34 right-hand column * | [A] - ZHAO, HUAMEI et al., "Study on Trans-glutiminase in Food Industry", FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (20081231), no. 9, ISSN 0022-1155, pages 137 - 141, XP009511564 [A] 1-10 * , see the whole document * | by applicant | EP0379606 | CN101381716 | CN101617740 | CN103525797 | CN103981168 | CN104024406 | CN104531653 | Opposition | WO03106333 | CN101857857 | WO2013064736 | - FUCHS, S., "Gelatin Nanoparticles as a modern platform for drug delivery", Doctoral dissertation, LMU Munchen, (20100000), pages 61 - 73, URL: https://edoc.ub.uni-muenchen.de/13692/1/Fuchs_Sebastian.pdf, XP055813292 | - RAJAKARI, K., "Structure modification of sour milk products by transglutaminase", Doctoral dissertation, (20150000), pages 44 - 51,106-123, URL: https://aaltodoc.aalto.fi/bitstream/handle/123456789/15873/isbn9789526061849.pdf?isAllowed=y&sequence=1, XP055813290 | - CUI, L. et al., "Stabilization of a new microbial transglutaminase from Streptomyces hygroscopicus WSH03-13 by spray drying", Process Biochemistry, (20060600), vol. 41, no. 6, pages 1427 - 1431, XP005402306 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.procbio.2006.01.002 | - BOURNEOW, C. et al., "Impact of some additives on the stability of microbial transglutaminase from Providencia sp. Cl 112", As J Food Ag-Ind, (20120000), vol. 5, no. 03, pages 226 - 233, XP055813296 | - KIELISZEK, M. et al., "Microbial transglutaminase and its application in the food industry. A review", Folia microbiologica, (20141108), vol. 59, no. 3, pages 241 - 250, XP035323972 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12223-013-0287-x | - WONG, C.M . et al., "Glucose oxidase: natural occurrence, function, properties and industrial applications", Applied microbiology and biotechnology, (20080311), vol. 78, no. 6, pages 927 - 938, XP019586374 | - "3 Production of industrial enzymes", Robert J. Whitehurst et al, Enzymes in Food Technology, Wiley-Blackwell, (2010), pages 44 - 58, XP055813325 | - Robert J. Whitehurst, Barry A. Law, "10 Commercial enzyme production and genetic modification of source organisms", Enzymes in Food Technology, CRC Press, (20020101), pages 229 - 244, XP055813315 | - CLELAND, J.L. et al., "Critical reviews in therapeutic drug carrier systems", Critical Reviews in Therapeutic Drug Carrier Systems, (19930000), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 307 - 377, XP002661804 | - "5.8 Methods of sterilization", WHO, The international pharmacopoeia. 5th ed., (2015), pages 1 - 3, XP055813331 | - "Physical properties of glycerine and its solutions", Glycerine Producers' Association, Glycerine and its solutions, Glycerine Producers' Association, (19630000), pages 1 - 27, XP055813337 | - NAKAGAWA, H. et al., "Molecular Basis of Water Activity in Glycerol-Water Mixtures", Frontiers in chemistry, (20191101), vol. 7, page 731, XP055813339 | - LILLEY, G.R. et al., "Detection of Ca2+-Dependent Transglutaminase Activity in Root and Leaf Tissue of Monocotyledonous and Dicotyledonous Plants", Plant physiology, (19980701), vol. 117, no. 3, pages 1115 - 1123, XP055813309 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.117.3.1115 | - BARRON J et al., "The Effects of Temperature on pH Measurement", TSP, (20110000), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 1 - 7, XP055813308 | - Mohamed Mathlouthi, "Water content, water activity, water structure and the stability of foodstuffs", Food Control, (20010101), pages 409 - 417, Food Control, URL: http://ac.els-cdn.com/S0956713501000329/1-s2.0-S0956713501000329-main.pdf?_tid=3d12a376-7336-11e6-ab79-00000aacb35f&acdnat=1473058927_5e26baff36926cae14bd09f1fd0c9072, (20160905), XP055299723 | - "Chapter 4 Comparison of Different Methods for Redox Potential Determination in Natural Waters", Kölling, M., Redox, Berlin, Heidelberg, Springer, (20000000), pages 42 - 54, XP055813344 | - Topcu A., Mckinnon I., Mcsweeney P.L.H., "Measurement of the Oxidation-Reduction Potential of cheddar Cheese", Journal of Food Science, Wiley-Blackwell Publishing, Inc, US, US, (20080401), vol. 73, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1750-3841.2008.00692.x, ISSN 0022-1147, pages C198 - C203, XP055813302 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1750-3841.2008.00692.x | - Rathin Datta, Michael Henry, "Lactic acid: recent advances in products, processes and technologies - a review", Journal of Chemical Technology and Biotechnology, wiley, (20060101), vol. 81, doi:10.1002/JCTB.1486, ISSN 0268-2575, pages 1119 - 1129, XP002603807 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/JCTB.1486 |