EP3419143 - NON-CONTACT POWER SUPPLY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Corporation 19, Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKIKAWA, Shinji c/o FUJI Corporation 19, Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu, Aichi / JP | 02 /
NOMURA, Takeshi c/o FUJI Corporation 19, Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu, Aichi / JP | 03 /
OKI, Masayuki c/o FUJI Corporation 19, Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu, Aichi / JP | [2023/41] |
Former [2019/07] | 01 /
TAKIKAWA, Shinji c/o FUJI Corporation 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu Aichi / JP | ||
02 /
NOMURA, Takeshi c/o FUJI Corporation 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu Aichi / JP | |||
03 /
OKI, Masayuki c/o FUJI Corporation 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu Aichi / JP | |||
Former [2018/52] | 01 /
TAKIKAWA Shinji c/o FUJI MACHINE MFG. CO. LTD. 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
NOMURA Takeshi c/o FUJI MACHINE MFG. CO. LTD. 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | |||
03 /
OKI Masayuki c/o FUJI MACHINE MFG. CO. LTD. 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 16890520.6 | 17.02.2016 | [2018/52] | WO2016JP54585 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017141378 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3419143 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3419143 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/00, H02J50/12 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
H02J50/12 (EP,US);
H01F38/14 (US);
H02J50/90 (US);
H02J50/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/52] | H02J50/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTAKTFREIEN STROMÜBERTRAGUNG | [2018/52] | English: | NON-CONTACT POWER SUPPLY DEVICE | [2018/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE SANS CONTACT | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2018 | Translation filed | 10.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 15.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2328254 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0051], [0052];; figures 4, 6A, 14; claims 1, 9 * [Y] 7; | [Y]EP2903131 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]) [Y] 7* paragraphs [0002], [0003], [0027]-[0033];; figures 1, 4 * | International search | [Y]JPH05344603 (DAIFUKU KK) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0021] to [0022]; fig. 8 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH1051982 (HITACHI KIDEN KOGYO KK) [Y] 4-7 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0021]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2013125372 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * , paragraph [0027]; fig. 3 & JP 2013-172503 A *; | [Y]WO2014049750 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]) [Y] 7 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0007], [0027] to [0033]; fig. 1 & US 2015/0249366 A1 paragraphs [0002] to [0008], [0034] to [0039]; fig. 1 & EP 2903131 A1 & CN 104662773 A *; | [Y]JP2014143843 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0033] to [0037]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2015122249 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7* , paragraph [0027]; fig. 3 & JP 2015-153891 A * |