EP3419769 - MODULAR PRESSURE WASHING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/01] | MODULAR POWER WASHER SYSTEM, METHOD, CONTROL CIRCUIT AND KIT THEREFOR | ||
[2024/07] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techtronic Outdoor Products Technology Limited Canon's Court 22 Victoria Street Hamilton HM12 / BM | [2021/32] |
Former [2020/47] | For all designated states TTI (Macao Commercial Offshore) Limited Units A-C, 26/F Centro Comercial da Praia Grande No. 429 Avenida da Praia Grande Macao / MO | ||
Former [2019/01] | For all designated states TTI (Macao Commercial Offshore) Limited Unit A-C, 26/F Centro Comercial da Praia Grande No. 429 Avenida de Praia Grande Macao / MO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICKEY, Todd 29/F Tower 2 Kowloon Commerce Centre 51 Kwai Cheong Road Kwai Chung, New Territories Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
ESCHRICH, Sven No.1 Chuang Ke Road Houjie Town Industrial Park Houjie Town Dongguan Guangdong 523960 / CN | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | Stevenson-Hill, Jack Patrick Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16891110.5 | 29.04.2016 | [2019/01] | WO2016CN80745 | Priority number, date | WO2016CN74288 | 22.02.2016 Original published format: PCT/CN2016/074288 | [2019/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017143656 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3419769 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/02, B05B1/00, H02J7/00 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
B08B3/026 (EP,US);
B08B3/028 (US);
B05B9/007 (EP,US);
B08B2203/0223 (EP,US);
B08B2203/027 (US);
B08B2203/0276 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Title | German: | MODULARES DRUCKREINIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2024/07] | English: | MODULAR PRESSURE WASHING SYSTEM | [2024/07] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LAVAGE MODULAIRE HAUTE PRESSION | [2024/07] |
Former [2019/01] | MODULARES DRUCKWÄSCHERSYSTEM, VERFAHREN, STEUERSCHALTUNG UND KIT DAFÜR | ||
Former [2019/01] | MODULAR POWER WASHER SYSTEM, METHOD, CONTROL CIRCUIT AND KIT THEREFOR | ||
Former [2019/01] | SYSTÈME DE LAVEUR MODULAIRE ÉLECTRIQUE, PROCÉDÉ, CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE ET KIT CORRESPONDANTS | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 14.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9201525U ; | [X]EP0504568 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO ALFRED [DE]); | [XY]EP0917912 (ELEKTRA BECKUM AG [DE]); | [X]US2006254008 (HAHN KLAUS K [US], et al); | [X]DE102008012357 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [Y]WO2009055588 (ROYAL APPLIANCE MFG CO D B A [US], et al); | [X]US2009116972 (GILPATRICK RICHARD J [US], et al); | [X]US2012234939 (BEARUP ADAM DEAN [US], et al); | [X]WO2013123966 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO KG ALFRED [DE], et al); | [XY]WO2014000824 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO KG ALFRED [DE], et al); | [IY]US2014265604 (MERGENER MATTHEW J [US]); | [Y]WO2015019620 (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]); | [Y]US2015050169 (HORIE NORIYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP2944432 (TECHTRONIC POWER TOOLS TECH [VG]); | [YA]WO2015194426 (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]); | EP3159541 [ ] (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]) | International search | [X]DE29717495U (WAP REINIGUNGSSYSTEME [DE]); | [A]US2002071225 (SHELDON MOBERG [US], et al); | [A]US2010282866 (GILPATRICK RICHARD J [US], et al); | [A]EP2573928 (BRUSA ELEKTRONIK AG [CH]); | [A]CN103166290 (SUNWODA ELECTRONIC CO LTD); | [X]US2014119949 (WISCHSTADT GREG [US], et al); | [A]CN204234393U (SICHUAN LIFENG TECHNOLOGY INC COMPANY) | by applicant | EP0917912 | US2015050169 |