EP3419084 - SINGLE-CELL BATTERY, BATTERY MODULE, POWER BATTERY, AND ELECTRIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYD Company Limited No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONG, Xubin No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Yanfei No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16891199.8 | 30.08.2016 | [2018/52] | WO2016CN97403 | Priority number, date | CN201610104218 | 25.02.2016 Original published format: CN201610104218 | [2018/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017143751 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3419084 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/34, H01M10/44 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
H01M50/147 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/572 (KR);
H01M50/578 (CN,KR,US);
H01M10/44 (KR,US);
H01M10/445 (CN,KR);
H01M10/48 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/176 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/209 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/502 (KR);
H01M50/55 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/574 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
H01M2200/20 (KR,US);
H01M2220/20 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Title | German: | EINZELLIGE BATTERIE, BATTERIEMODUL, LEISTUNGSBATTERIE UND ELEKTROFAHRZEUG | [2018/52] | English: | SINGLE-CELL BATTERY, BATTERY MODULE, POWER BATTERY, AND ELECTRIC VEHICLE | [2018/52] | French: | BATTERIE À ÉLÉMENT UNIQUE, MODULE DE BATTERIE, BATTERIE D'ALIMENTATION ET VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2018 | Translation filed | 11.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 11.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0930662 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]CN204632818U (GUANGZHOU LITHIUMFORCE ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]CN104900820 (FUJIAN NANPING NANFU BATTERY) [I] 10* abstract * | International search | [X]CN203733907U (CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY LTD) [X] 1-7, 13-17 * , description, paragraphs [0020]-[0026], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [XA]CN204946952U (CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY LTD) [X] 1-7, 13-17 * , description, paragraphs [0032]-[0034] and [0045]-[0054], and figures 1 and 2, the whole document * [A] 8-12; | [PX]CN205488328U (BYD CO LTD) [PX] 1-17* , claims 1-17, and description, paragraphs [0073]-[0079] * |