EP3424770 - EXTENDED-RANGE ELECTRIC PASSENGER VEHICLE HAVING FRONT-MOUNTED ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technologies' Xanadu of Resonatory-Solar- Systemed Co., Ltd. Room 301-1 (DeSheng Zone) No.2 Xinfeng Road Xicheng District Beijing 100088 / CN | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Pu Floor 25th Building III of World Trade Center Jianguomenwai Street No. 1 Chaoyang District Beijing 100004 / CN | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Conti, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 16892141.9 | 15.03.2016 | [2019/02] | WO2016CN76387 | Priority number, date | CN201610115067 | 01.03.2016 Original published format: CN201610115067 | [2019/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017147950 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3424770 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3424770 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60K3/04, B60K7/00, // B60K6/48, B60K6/52, B60L50/16, B60L50/60, B60L58/26, B60K1/04, F02C6/20 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
B60K1/04 (EP,KR,US);
B60K3/04 (EP,KR,US);
B60K6/24 (CN,US);
B60K13/00 (KR);
B60K13/02 (CN);
B60K13/04 (CN);
B60K15/03 (KR);
B60K6/40 (US);
B60K6/448 (US);
B60K6/48 (EP);
B60K6/52 (EP);
B60K7/0007 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B60L50/10 (KR);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L50/60 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (EP,US);
B60L58/10 (KR);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
B60L58/33 (KR);
F02C6/20 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0092 (KR,US);
B60L2220/58 (KR);
B60Y2200/91 (EP,KR,US);
B60Y2200/92 (EP,US);
B60Y2300/188 (US);
B60Y2400/431 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/41] | B60K3/04, B60K1/04, B60K6/24, B60K6/40, B60K6/448, B60K7/00, F02C6/20, B60L50/10, B60L50/61 | ||
Former IPC [2019/02] | B60L11/02, B60K3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES PERSONENKRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT ERWEITERTEM BEREICH MIT FRONTMOTOR | [2019/02] | English: | EXTENDED-RANGE ELECTRIC PASSENGER VEHICLE HAVING FRONT-MOUNTED ENGINE | [2019/02] | French: | VÉHICULE DE TOURISME ÉLECTRIQUE À RAYON D'ACTION ÉTENDU COMPRENANT UN MOTEUR MONTÉ À L'AVANT | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2018 | Translation filed | 12.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 24.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 04.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2016 | AL | 01.12.2021 | AT | 01.12.2021 | CY | 01.12.2021 | CZ | 01.12.2021 | DK | 01.12.2021 | EE | 01.12.2021 | ES | 01.12.2021 | FI | 01.12.2021 | HR | 01.12.2021 | LT | 01.12.2021 | LV | 01.12.2021 | MC | 01.12.2021 | MK | 01.12.2021 | NL | 01.12.2021 | PL | 01.12.2021 | RO | 01.12.2021 | RS | 01.12.2021 | SE | 01.12.2021 | SI | 01.12.2021 | SK | 01.12.2021 | SM | 01.12.2021 | TR | 01.12.2021 | BG | 01.03.2022 | NO | 01.03.2022 | GR | 02.03.2022 | IE | 15.03.2022 | IT | 15.03.2022 | LU | 15.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | IS | 01.04.2022 | PT | 01.04.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 15.03.2016 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
MK | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
IT | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 15.03.2016 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
IT | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 15.03.2016 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
IT | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
IT | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 01.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5482791 (SHINGAI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9* column 7, line 1 - column 16, line 42; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]US6213234 (ROSEN HAROLD A [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 2, line 65 - column 7, line 3; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]WO2010020020 (DIMITROV EMIL [BG], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 3 - page 4; figure -; claim - *; | [XI]GB2466081 (ETV MOTORS LTD [IL]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 8 - page 31; figure -; claim - * [I] 3-5,8,9; | [Y]CN104786858 (ZHIYUETENGFENG TECHNOLOGY INVEST CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0056]; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]CN104802629 (ZHIYUE TENGFENG TECHNOLOGY INVEST CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0051]; figure -; claim - * | International search | [Y]CN202243043U (DLG BATTERY ZHENGZHOU CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * , description, pages 1-3, and figures 1-3 *; | [A]CN102658779 (HANGZHOU PULAGE NEW ENERGY POWER SYSTEMS CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , the whole document *; | [Y]CN104802629 (ZHIYUE TENGFENG TECHNOLOGY INVEST CO LTD) [Y] 2-5, 8-9 * , description, pages 1-5, and figures 1-3 *; | [Y]CN204586535U (TXR S TECHNOLOGY INVEST CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * , description, pages 1-3, and figures 1-2 *; | [A]CN204605496U (ZHIYUE TENGFENG TECHNOLOGY INVEST CO LTD) [A] 1-9* , the whole document *; | [E]CN205395747U (ZHIYUE TENGFENG TECH INVEST CO LTD) [E] 1-9 * , claims 1-10 * |